EP1200158 - MIXTURE FOR THE TREATMENT OF WASTE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geodur Cis AG Oberallmendstrasse 20a 6302 Zug / CH | [2002/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWETLICK, Wolfgang Hinterbergstr. 25 CH-6318 Walchwil / CH | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00958362.6 | 02.08.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000EP07486 | Priority number, date | DE1999136324 | 02.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19936324 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0108753 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1200158 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1200158 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A62D3/00 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
A62D3/37 (EP,US);
A62D3/33 (EP,US);
B09B3/25 (EP,US);
B09C1/08 (EP,US);
C04B18/0463 (EP,US);
C04B28/001 (EP,US);
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B28/04 (EP,US);
C05C9/00 (EP,US);
C05G3/80 (EP,US);
A62D2101/08 (EP,US);
A62D2101/24 (EP,US);
A62D2101/43 (EP,US);
A62D2203/04 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00767 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/001, C04B18/10, C04B24/02, C04B24/085, C04B24/085, C04B24/12, C04B2103/65 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B18/0463, C04B22/062, C04B24/085, C04B24/085, C04B24/085, C04B24/122 (EP,US);
C04B28/02, C04B18/0472, C04B24/02, C04B24/085, C04B24/085, C04B24/12, C04B2103/65 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B18/10, C04B22/062, C04B24/122, C04B2103/001, C04B2103/002, C04B2103/65 (US,EP);
C04B28/04, C04B18/0463, C04B24/02, C04B24/085, C04B24/085, C04B24/12, C04B2103/65 (EP,US);
C05C9/00, C05D9/00, C05D9/02 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 30.01.2002 | Title | German: | GEMISCH ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABFALLMATERIAL | [2002/18] | English: | MIXTURE FOR THE TREATMENT OF WASTE MATERIALS | [2002/18] | French: | MELANGE SERVANT AU TRAITEMENT DE DECHETS | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 21.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN1066672 ; | [A]SU1310411 ; | [A]GB2154996 (HAGER BROR OLOF); | [A]WO9323087 (COX JAMES P [US], et al); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 33, Database accession no. 1993-259287, XP002154939 & CN1066672 A 19921202 (XIONG M) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 01, Database accession no. 1988-005256, XP002154940 & SU1310411 A 19870515 (FILATOV V K) [A] 1 * abstract * |