EP1208694 - CHARGING FOR PREPAID SUBSCRIBERS IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAATAJA, Timo Wergelanos Alle 17 DK-2860 Soborg / DK | 02 /
ANDRESEN, Lars Judithsvej 15 St Tv DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Honkasalo, Terhi Marjut Anneli Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Honkasalo, Terhi Marjut Anneli Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2002/22] | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani Kolster Oy Ab,P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00958543.1 | 01.09.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000FI00742 | Priority number, date | FI19990001874 | 02.09.1999 Original published format: FI 991874 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0117222 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208694 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04M17/00 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H04M15/745 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
H04M15/80 (EP,US);
H04M17/00 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0108 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0152 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABRECHNUNG VON PREPAID-BENUTZERN IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKTIONSSYSTEM | [2002/22] | English: | CHARGING FOR PREPAID SUBSCRIBERS IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2002/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECLAMATION AUPRES DES ABONNES DETENTEURS DE TELECARTES DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 15.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/41] | 14.07.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/41] | Appeal following examination | 08.06.2007 | Appeal received No. T1493/07 | 15.08.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.07.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 14.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0572991 (FROMER SHMUEL [IL]); | [X]GB2322771 (ORANGE PERSONAL COMM SERV LTD [GB]); | [A]WO9857488 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al); | [A]US5909485 (MARTIN DANIEL [FR], et al) | Examination | EP0779750 | WO9918713 |