EP1196118 - NOVEL KNEE PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bercovy, Michel 32, rue Vaugelas 75015 Paris / FR | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00958608.2 | 25.07.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000FR02133 | Priority number, date | FR19990009664 | 26.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909664 | [2002/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0106961 | Date: | 01.02.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196118 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1196118 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
A61F2/3868 (EP,US);
A61F2/3859 (EP,US);
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30364 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30518 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30878 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30943 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE KNIEPROTHESE | [2002/16] | English: | NOVEL KNEE PROSTHESIS | [2002/16] | French: | NOUVELLE PROTHESE DU GENOU | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 19.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2621243 (CUILLERON J [FR], et al) [A] 1* figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5609639 (WALKER PETER S [GB]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | Examination | WO9846171 | - The Journal of Arthroplasty, Vol.11, No.2, 1996, pages 166-172,'A Correlative Study of the Geometry and Anatomy of the Distal Femur, Elias S.G., February 27 1990 |