EP1226679 - COMMUNICATION PROTOCOL FOR SECURE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Solutions, Inc. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg IL 60196 / US | [2011/14] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNAPCZYK, Stanley 8044 South Deer Path Justice, IL 60458 / US | 02 /
MURRILL, Larry 1813 Georgia Court Unit 203 Schaumburg, IL 60193 / US | [2014/19] |
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
KNAPCZYK, Stanley 8044 South Deer Path Justice, IL 60458 / US | ||
02 /
MURRILL, Larry 1813 Georgia Court, Unit 203 Schaumburg, IL 60193 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2002/31] | McCormack, Derek James Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00959425.0 | 25.08.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000US23395 | Priority number, date | US19990425816 | 22.10.1999 Original published format: US 425816 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0131837 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226679 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226679 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04L29/06 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
H04L9/0891 (EP,US);
H04L9/0838 (EP);
H04W12/04 (EP,US);
H04L2209/34 (EP);
H04L2209/80 (EP);
H04L63/062 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/31] | H04L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSPROTOKOLL FÜR GESICHERTE KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME | [2002/31] | English: | COMMUNICATION PROTOCOL FOR SECURE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | [2002/31] | French: | PROTOCOLE DE COMMUNICATIONS DESTINE A DES SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATIONS SECURISEES | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IE | 25.08.2014 | LU | 25.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2015/37] |
Former [2015/30] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5164986 (BRIGHT MICHAEL W [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 12 - line 19 * * column 8, line 8 - line 33 * * column 10, line 1 - line 25 * * column 15, line 26 - line 47 * * figures 8,11,12,14,15A,15G,15W,15X * * column 15, line 63 - column 16, line 17 *; | [Y]US5408613 (OKABAYASHI ICHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5093860 (STEINBRENNER KURT W [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5173938 (STEINBRENNER KURT W [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5093860 (STEINBRENNER KURT W [US], et al); | [Y] - FREIER ALAN ET AL., The SSL protocol version 3.0, INTERNET DRAFT, (19961118), XP002939604 [Y] * page 18 - page 19 * | [Y] - STEVENS W., TCP/IP illustrated, ADDISON WESLEY LONGMAN, INC., (1994), XP002939603 [Y] * Volume 1, pages 23 and 34 * | Examination | EP1214811 | by applicant | EP1214811 |