EP1266272 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING STEP-DOWN POWER CONVERSION USING AN INTELLIGENT SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intra International AB Fabriksgatan 10 412 50 Göteborg / SE | [2002/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARUPPANA, Samy, V. 23233 62nd Avenue S. Kent, WA 98032 / US | 02 /
JETHA, Aly, Amirali 2400 4th Avenue, No. 102 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | 03 /
THOMSEN, Jes Irlandsvej 102 DK-2300 Copenhagen S. / DK | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Picker, Madeline Margaret Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Picker, Madeline Margaret Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00959808.7 | 01.09.2000 | [2002/51] | WO2000US24168 | Priority number, date | US19990153372P | 10.09.1999 Original published format: US 153372 P | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0118625 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266272 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/56 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
H02M3/157 (EP);
H02J1/06 (EP);
H02J7/1492 (EP);
B60R16/03 (EP);
H02J2310/40 (EP);
H02J2310/46 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR LEISTUNGSVERMINDERUNG MIT EINEM INTELlIGENTEN SCHALTER | [2002/51] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING STEP-DOWN POWER CONVERSION USING AN INTELLIGENT SWITCH | [2002/51] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE SERVANT A EFFECTUER UNE CONVERSION DE LIMITATION PROGRESSIVE DE COURANT AU MOYEN D'UN COMMUTATEUR INTELLIGENT | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 28.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/08] | 21.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.12.2003 | 30.09.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19726773 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 5, line 3 - line 45; figure 2 *; | [X]US5864116 (BAKER IVAN E [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 5, line 45 - column 6; figure 1; claim 67 * | International search | [A]US5907233 (JABAJI ISSAM [US]); | [XP]US5973488 (FACKLER RUPERT [DE]); | [XP]US5977758 (NOGUCHI MINORU [JP], et al); | [XP]US5986442 (ABE ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [AP]US6031361 (BURSTEIN ANDREW J [US], et al); | [AP]US6054846 (CASTLEMAN NEAL J [US]) |