EP1226463 - AUTOMATIC ALIGNMENT SYSTEM FOR COUPLING MULTIPLE LIGHT SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO-RAD LABORATORIES, INC. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states BIO-RAD LABORATORIES, INC. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules California 94547 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YETSO, Stephen, C. 238 Junipero Street Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | 02 /
NGUYEN, Quan 288 Whitmore, Apt. 124 Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 03 /
ANDREWS, Timothy 1792 Tulare Avenue Richmond, CA 94805 / US | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00959847.5 | 31.08.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000US24247 | Priority number, date | US19990151704P | 31.08.1999 Original published format: US 151704 P | US20000651740 | 30.08.2000 Original published format: US 651740 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0116639 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226463 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/02 | [2002/31] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES AUSRICHTUNGSSYSTEM ZUR KOPPLUNG VON MEHREREN LICHTQUELLEN | [2002/31] | English: | AUTOMATIC ALIGNMENT SYSTEM FOR COUPLING MULTIPLE LIGHT SOURCES | [2002/31] | French: | SYSTEME D'ALIGNEMENT AUTOMATIQUE POUR COUPLAGE DE SOURCES LUMINEUSES MULTIPLES | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 25.02.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5450508 (DECUSATIS CASIMER M ET AL) [X] 1-6,9-11,13,14,16,17,19,20 * abstract * * column 4, lines 56-68 * * column 7, line 8 - column 8, line 65 * [Y] 14-17,19,20; | [Y]EP0567143 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES ;NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE (JP)) [Y] 14-17,19,20 * abstract * * page 4, column 345, line 17 *; | [Y]US4896935 (LEE HO-SHANG) [Y] 14-17,19,20 * abstract * * column 8, line 24 - column 9, line 9 *; | [Y]US5864643 (PAN JING-JONG) [Y] 14-17,19,20 * abstract * * column 1, lines 10-17 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 59 *; | [A]US4758061 (HORN JOACHIM) [A] 1,9,14,20 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 28 * |