EP1221877 - INFLATABLE AIR CELL HAVING COMBINED PNEUMATICALLY ADJUSTED OCCUPANT SUPPORT AND THERMAL CONDITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | New entry: Reply to examination report | 08.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTEX Seat Comfort Limited Beech Avenue, Derby Road Burton on Trent Staffordshire DE13 0BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states CTEX Seat Comfort Limited Beech Avenue, Derby Road Burton on Trent, Staffordshire DE13 OBQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states McCORD WINN TEXTRON INC. 645 Harvey Road Manchester, NH 03103 / US | ||
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states CTEX Seat Comfort Limited Beech Avenue, Derby Road Burton on Trent, Staffordshire DE13 OBQ / GB | ||
For all designated states Rhodes, Richard D. 13 Lil Nor Avenue Somersworth, NH 03878 / US | |||
For all designated states Moran, Scott J. 176 Highland Avenue Winchester, MA 01890 / US | |||
For all designated states Burt, Stephen J. Skarries View, Tokers Green Lane Kidmore End, Reading RG4 9EB / GB | |||
For all designated states Weeks, Ryan K. 35 Andrew Street, Apartment 6 Manchester, NH 03104-2416 / US | |||
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states McCORD WINN TEXTRON INC. 645 Harvey Road Manchester, NH 03103 / US | ||
For all designated states Rhodes, Richard D. 13 Lil Nor Avenue Somersworth, NH 03878 / US | |||
For all designated states Moran, Scott J. 176 Highland Avenue Winchester, MA 01890 / US | |||
For all designated states Burt, Stephen J. Skarries View, Tokers Green Lane Kidmore End, Reading RG4 9EB / GB | |||
For all designated states Weeks, Ryan K. 35 Andrew Street, Apartment 6 Manchester, NH 03104-2416 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RHODES, Richard, D. 13 Lil Nor Avenue Somersworth, NH 03878 / US | 02 /
MORAN, Scott, J. 30 Westminster Street, 14th Floor, Providence Rhode Island 02903 / US | 03 /
BURT, Stephen, J. Skarries View Tokers Green Lane Kidmore End Reading RG4 9EB / GB | 04 /
WEEKS, Ryan, K. 35 Andrew Street, Apartment 6 Manchester, NH 03104-2416 / US | [2002/45] |
Former [2002/29] | 01 /
RHODES, Richard, D. 13 Lil Nor Avenue Somersworth, NH 03878 / US | ||
02 /
MORAN, Scott, J. 176 Highland Avenue Winchester, MA 01890 / US | |||
03 /
BURT, Stephen, J. Skarries View Tokers Green Lane Kidmore End Reading RG4 9EB / GB | |||
04 /
WEEKS, Ryan, K. 35 Andrew Street, Apartment 6 Manchester, NH 03104-2416 / US | Representative(s) | Goodenough, Nigel A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Goodenough, Nigel A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00959974.7 | 07.09.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000US24526 | Priority number, date | US19990393606 | 10.09.1999 Original published format: US 393606 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0117402 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1221877 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/08, A47C27/10, A47C21/04 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
A47C27/10 (EP,US);
A47C21/044 (EP,US);
A47C21/048 (EP,US);
A47C27/082 (EP,US);
A47C27/083 (EP,US);
A47C27/18 (EP,US);
A47C4/54 (EP,US);
A47C7/467 (EP,US);
A47C7/744 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/29] | A47C27/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AUFBLASBARE LUFTZELLE MIT KOMBINIERTER VERSTELLBARER KÖRPERSTÜTZE UND KLIMAANLAGE | [2002/29] | English: | INFLATABLE AIR CELL HAVING COMBINED PNEUMATICALLY ADJUSTED OCCUPANT SUPPORT AND THERMAL CONDITIONING | [2002/29] | French: | CELLULE PNEUMATIQUE GONFLABLE COMPORTANT UN SUPPORT D'OCCUPANT COMBINE REGLABLE PNEUMATIQUEMENT ET CLIMATISATION | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 04.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/41] | 19.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3822425 (SCALES J) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - column 2, line 49 * * column 4, line 8 - column 4, line 25 *; | [X]US4638519 (HESS JACK H [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * column 5, line 51 - column 7, line 5 *; | [Y]WO9510211 (CHOI BYUNG SOON [KR]) [Y] 5 * page 1, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5640728 (GRAEBE ROBERT H [US]) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 30 *; | [XY]EP0812555 (HILL ROM CO INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * abstract * * column 9, line 9 - column 9, line 45 * * column 11, line 10 - column 11, line 30 * [Y] 5,6; | [Y]US5887304 (VON DER HEYDE CHRISTIAN P [US]) [Y] 5* column 6, line 25 - column 6, line 45; figure - * | International search | [Y]US3127931 (JOHNSON LAURENCE H); | [X]US5379471 (HOLDREDGE TERRY K [US]) |