EP1218838 - METHOD OF AND SYSTEM FOR AUTHORIZING PURCHASES MADE OVER A COMPUTER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MasterCard International Incorporated 2000 Purchase Street Purchase, NY 10577 / US | [2010/44] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Rysix Holdings, LLC 2517 North Burling Chicago, IL 60614 / US | ||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Epacific Inc. 5638 Hollister Avenue Santa Barbara, CA 93117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KING, Douglas, W. 4454 Kenai Court Santa Maria, CA 93455 / US | [2002/36] |
Former [2002/27] | 01 /
KING, Douglas, W. 5638 Hollister Avenue Santa Barbara, CA 93117 / US | Representative(s) | Holme Nielsen, Marianne, et al Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Holme, Edvard Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | ||
Former [2002/27] | Holme, Edvard Holme Patent A/S, Vesterbrogade 20 1620 Copenhagen V. / DK | Application number, filing date | 00960027.1 | 07.09.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000US24631 | Priority number, date | US19990391285 | 07.09.1999 Original published format: US 391285 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0118720 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1218838 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1218838 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/10, G06Q20/02, G06Q20/04, G06Q20/12, G06Q20/36, G06Q20/38, G06Q30/06, G06Q30/08, G06Q40/04, G06Q40/02 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G06Q20/385 (EP,US);
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0603 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0613 (EP,US);
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
G06Q40/03 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/04] | G06F17/60 | ||
Former IPC [2002/27] | G06F17/60, H04M17/00, H04M11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2017/18] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 08.04.2002 | LT | 08.04.2002 | LV | 08.04.2002 | MK | 08.04.2002 | RO | 08.04.2002 | SI | 08.04.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUTOMISIERUNG VON EINKAUFEN ÜBER EIN COMPUTERNETZWERK | [2002/27] | English: | METHOD OF AND SYSTEM FOR AUTHORIZING PURCHASES MADE OVER A COMPUTER NETWORK | [2002/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'AUTORISATION D'ACHATS EFFECTUES SUR UN RESEAU INFORMATIQUE | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16193234.8 Application withdrawn : 11.11.2016 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | IT | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IE | 07.09.2017 | LU | 07.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/28] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9516971 (OPEN MARKET INC [US]); | [Y]US5770843 (ROSE MANNING I [US], et al) [Y] 1,4-8,11-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9840809 (CHA TECH SERV INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 14, line 23 - page 17, line 26 * * page 21, line 22 - page 26, line 7 *; | [Y]EP0921487 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4-8,11-23 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2332833 (INTERACTIVE MAGAZINES LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5826245 (SANDBERG-DIMENT ERIK [US]); | [YP]US6052675 (CHECCHIO ROBERT ANTHONY [US]); | [AP]US6098053 (SLATER ALAN [US]); | [AP]US6105008 (DAVIS VIRGIL M [US], et al) | Examination | US5809143 | US5884271 | WO9914711 | GB2333878 | by applicant | US5770843 | WO9840809 | US5884271 | EP0921487 |