EP1228613 - PULSE TRANSMISSION TRANSCEIVER ARCHITECTURE FOR LOW POWER COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UT-Battelle, LLC 111-B Union Valley Road Oak Ridge, Tennessee 37831-6498 / US | [2005/38] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states UT-Battelle, LLC Post Office Box 2008 111 Union Valley Road OAK Ridge, TN 37831-6498 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRESS, William, B., Jr. 1216 Nighthawk Lane Knoxville, TN 37928 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Stephen, F. 550 Pickel Road Loudon, TN 37774 / US | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2002/32] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00960057.8 | 08.09.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000US24726 | Priority number, date | US19990404009 | 23.09.1999 Original published format: US 404009 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0122672 | Date: | 29.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1228613 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1228613 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/49, H04L25/03, H04B1/69, H04B14/02, H04J13/02 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
H04L25/49 (EP,US);
H04B1/7172 (EP,US);
H04B1/7174 (EP,US);
H04L25/03834 (EP,US);
H04B1/71637 (EP,US);
H04B1/719 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/32] | H04L25/49, H04L25/03, H04B1/69, H04B14/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARCHITEKTUR EINES PULSÜBERTRAGUNGSSENDER-EMPFÄNGERS FÜR NIEDRIGLEISTUNGSKOMMUNIKATION | [2002/32] | English: | PULSE TRANSMISSION TRANSCEIVER ARCHITECTURE FOR LOW POWER COMMUNICATIONS | [2002/32] | French: | ARCHITECTURE D'UN EMETTEUR-RECEPTEUR A TRANSMISSION PAR IMPULSIONS POUR DES COMMUNICATIONS A FAIBLE PUISSANCE | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 24.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04026043.2 / EP1505785 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2006 | BE | 22.02.2006 | CH | 22.02.2006 | CY | 22.02.2006 | FI | 22.02.2006 | IT | 22.02.2006 | LI | 22.02.2006 | NL | 22.02.2006 | DK | 22.05.2006 | SE | 22.05.2006 | GR | 23.05.2006 | ES | 02.06.2006 | PT | 24.07.2006 | LU | 08.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 22.02.2006 | |
BE | 22.02.2006 | ||
CH | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
IT | 22.02.2006 | ||
LI | 22.02.2006 | ||
NL | 22.02.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
LU | 08.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 22.02.2006 | |
BE | 22.02.2006 | ||
CH | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
IT | 22.02.2006 | ||
LI | 22.02.2006 | ||
NL | 22.02.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 22.02.2006 | |
BE | 22.02.2006 | ||
CH | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
IT | 22.02.2006 | ||
LI | 22.02.2006 | ||
NL | 22.02.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 22.02.2006 | |
BE | 22.02.2006 | ||
CH | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
IT | 22.02.2006 | ||
LI | 22.02.2006 | ||
NL | 22.02.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 22.02.2006 | |
BE | 22.02.2006 | ||
CH | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
LI | 22.02.2006 | ||
NL | 22.02.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 22.02.2006 | |
CH | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
LI | 22.02.2006 | ||
NL | 22.02.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 22.02.2006 | |
CH | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
LI | 22.02.2006 | ||
NL | 22.02.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 22.02.2006 | |
CH | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
LI | 22.02.2006 | ||
NL | 22.02.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 22.02.2006 | |
CH | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
LI | 22.02.2006 | ||
NL | 22.02.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 22.02.2006 | |
CH | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
LI | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 22.02.2006 | |
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
LI | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 22.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR2706104 (KLIBANOV ELVARD [FR]) [Y] 26,28,31-35,39,40,42-49,54-58,78 * abstract * * page 6, line 27 - page 8, line 10 * * page 9, line 9 - page 11, line 11 * * figures 1,3,4 * [A] 1-25,27,29,30,36-38,41,50-53,76; | [XAY]EP0851603 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 76,77,79,80 * column 2, line 21 - line 55 * * column 6, line 26 - column 9, line 27 * * figures 2-4 * [A] 81-83 [Y] 78; | [XAY]WO9834339 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-8,10-14,17-19,21-23 * abstract * * page 12, line 5 - page 13, line 13 * * page 17, line 25 - page 19, line 25 * * figures 1,2A,3A,3B,3C,4,6A,6B,6C * [A] 9,15,16,20,24,25,27,29,30,36-38,41,50-53,62,68,72,75 [Y] 26,28,31-35,39,40,42-49,54-61,63-67,69-71,73,74; | [YA] - ELMIRGHANI J ET AL, "SLOT AND FRAME SYNCHRONISATION IN OPTICAL FIBER PPM SYSTEMS WITH DISPERSED PULSE SHAPES", JOURNAL OF OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS,DE,FACHVERLAG SCHIELE & SCHON, BERLIN, (1994), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 0173-4911, pages 5 - 10, XP000422686 [Y] 59-61,63-67,69-71,73,74 * page 5, column 2, line 20 - page 6, column 1, line 13 * * page 7, column 1, line 5 - page 8, column 1, line 12 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1-25,62,68,72,75 |