EP1218690 - METHOD FOR DETECTING THE SPATIAL POSITION OF A TRACKING MIRROR AND MIRROR ARRANGEMENT FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Geosystems AG Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2005/30] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Leica Geosystems AG Mönchmattweg 5 5035 Unterentfelden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER, Dietrich Leimenweg 12 CH-5018 Niedererlinsbach / CH | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Frei, Alexandra Sarah, et al Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah, et al Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2002/27] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 768 8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00960282.2 | 28.09.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000CH00528 | Priority number, date | CH19990001828 | 06.10.1999 Original published format: CH 182899 | [2002/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0125722 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1218690 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1218690 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/26, G01S7/481, G01S17/08, G01S17/42, G01S17/66 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
G01B11/26 (EP,US);
G01S17/08 (EP,US);
G01S17/42 (EP,US);
G01S17/66 (EP,US);
G01S7/4812 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER RÄUMLICHEN LAGE EINES ZIELVERFOLGUNGSSPIEGELS UND SPIEGELANORDNUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2002/27] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING THE SPATIAL POSITION OF A TRACKING MIRROR AND MIRROR ARRANGEMENT FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2002/27] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA POSITION SPATIALE D'UN MIROIR DE POURSUITE ET ENSEMBLE MIROIR PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE LEDIT PROCEDE | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 30.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.04.2006 | FI | 26.04.2006 | FR | 26.04.2006 | GB | 26.04.2006 | IE | 26.04.2006 | IT | 26.04.2006 | NL | 26.04.2006 | DK | 26.07.2006 | SE | 26.07.2006 | GR | 27.07.2006 | ES | 06.08.2006 | PT | 26.09.2006 | AT | 28.09.2006 | LU | 28.09.2006 | BE | 30.09.2006 | CH | 30.09.2006 | LI | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
GB | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
IT | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
GR | 27.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
AT | 28.09.2006 | ||
LU | 28.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
GB | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
IT | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
GR | 27.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
AT | 28.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
GB | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
IT | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
AT | 28.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
GB | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
IT | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
GB | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
IT | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
GB | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
GB | 26.04.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 26.07.2006 | |
ES | 06.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 26.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4714339 (LAU KAM C [US], et al) [AD] 1,8* abstract *; | [A]WO9305360 (RENISHAW TRANSDUCER SYST [GB]) [A] 1,8 * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 7 * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0704685 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 50 * * column 6, line 45 - line 59 * * column 7, line 10 - column 8, line 46 * * figure - *; | [A]US5724130 (WANG CHARLES [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 13 - line 39 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0919830 (SECRETARY TRADE IND BRIT [GB]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * |