EP1224325 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING NUCLEIC AND/OR AMINO ACID SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 253 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [2002/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOLDO, Luca Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 1 69514 Laudenbach / DE | 02 /
RIPPMANN, Friedrich Schröderstrasse 79 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 00960458.8 | 16.08.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000EP07953 | Priority number, date | DE1999141606 | 01.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19941606 | [2002/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0120024 | Date: | 22.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1224325 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
G16B30/00 (EP);
G16B30/10 (EP,US);
G16B40/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERMITTELN VON NUKLEIN- UND/ODER AMINOSÄURESEQUENZEN | [2002/30] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING NUCLEIC AND/OR AMINO ACID SEQUENCES | [2002/30] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER DES SEQUENCES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET/OU D'ACIDES AMINES | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 01.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/36] | 06.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.01.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   30.01.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5871697 (ROTHBERG JONATHAN MARC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** column 58, paragraph 2 - column 59, paragraph 2 *; | [E]WO0063687 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * page 44, line 5 - page 45, line 10 *; | [E]WO0113105 (AGY THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y] - MADDEN T L ET AL, "APPLICATIONS OF NETWORK BLAST SERVER", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY,ACADEMIC PRESS INC, SAN DIEGO, CA,US, (1996), vol. 266, ISSN 0076-6879, pages 131 - 141, XP001006313 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0076-6879(96)66011-X | [Y] - WORLEY K C ET AL, "BEAUTY: AN ENHANCED BLAST-BASED SEARCH TOOL THAT INTEGRATES MULTIPLE BIOLOGICAL INFORMATION RESOURCES INTO SEQUENCE SIMILARITY SEARCH RESULTS", GENOME RESEARCH,US,COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (19950901), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 173 - 184, XP000534406 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * |