EP1226308 - SAFETY ELEMENT AND A VALUABLE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2002/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMITZ, Christian Josefstalerstrasse 3g 83727 Schliersee-Neuhaus / DE | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/22] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00960544.5 | 29.08.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000EP08415 | Priority number, date | DE19991041295 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19941295 | [2002/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0116426 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226308 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226308 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1226308 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/48, B41M3/14, B41M5/28, B41M5/40, B42D15/00 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
D21H21/48 (EP,US);
B42D25/355 (EP,US);
G03H1/0011 (EP,US);
Y10S428/916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENT UND WERTGEGENSTAND | [2002/31] | English: | SAFETY ELEMENT AND A VALUABLE OBJECT | [2002/31] | French: | ELEMENT DE SECURITE ET OBJET DE VALEUR | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 04.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2007
25.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE Arjowiggins Security 117 Quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR Opponent's representative Tanty, François Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2007
25.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE Arjowiggins Security 117 Quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR Opponent's representative Tanty, François Nony & Associés Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 3, rue de Penthièvre F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2007
Arjowiggins Security 117 Quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR Opponent's representative Carré, Claudine Bernadette Arjo Wiggins 117, quai du Président Roosevelt F-92442 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | 30.04.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.08.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.05.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.10.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 18.03.2009 | Appeal received No. T0644/09 | 20.05.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.05.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 27.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.06.2011 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | IE | 21.06.2006 | LU | 29.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | BE | 31.08.2009 | IT | 29.08.2010 | ES | 30.08.2010 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/31] | CY | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
LU | 29.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2009 | ||
IT | 29.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | CY | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
LU | 29.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/03] | CY | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
LU | 29.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
LU | 29.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 21.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE2212350 (TIMM HERMANN M); | [A]DE2909731 (OESTERR NATIONALBANK) [A] 1,2,29 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0526019 (PILOT INK CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,15-17,20,21,29 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0608078 (PORTALS BATHFORD LTD [GB]); | [E]WO0054985 (RUE DE INT LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1,2,4,8,15,19,26,28,29 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 4 * * page 11, line 13 - line 22 * * claims 1,7-10,17 * | Opposition | AU73762 | FR2038104 | GB2201376 | CA2032587 | EP0522217 | EP0787656 | WO9835096 | - R.L. VAN RENESSE, Optical document Security, (1988), page 96-367 |