EP1144837 - FUEL SUPPLY PUMP FOR A VEHICLE AND A FUEL SUPPLY SYSTEM EQUIPPED WITH SAID FUEL SUPPLY PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Gregor Hortenseweg 6 85737 Ismaning / DE | [2001/42] | Application number, filing date | 00960652.6 | 13.09.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000EP08918 | Priority number, date | DE1999149902 | 16.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19949902 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0129394 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144837 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144837 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/10, F04B17/04, F04B49/24, F04C15/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
F02M37/08 (EP,US);
F02M31/20 (EP,US);
F04B53/08 (EP,US);
F04D29/588 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFF-FÖRDERPUMPE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND EIN MIT EINER SOLCHEN KRAFTSTOFF-FÖRDERPUMPE VERSEHENES KRAFTSTOFF-FÖRDERSYSTEM | [2001/42] | English: | FUEL SUPPLY PUMP FOR A VEHICLE AND A FUEL SUPPLY SYSTEM EQUIPPED WITH SAID FUEL SUPPLY PUMP | [2001/42] | French: | POMPE D'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT POUR UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT EQUIPE D'UNE TELLE POMPE | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 22.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.11.2004 | IT | 24.11.2004 | ES | 06.03.2005 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 24.11.2004 | |
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | ES | 06.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1358135 (PIERBURG AUTOGERAETEBAU KG) [A] 1,2,4 * figure 1; claim 1 * * page 1, line 10 - line 65 * * page 1, line 88 - page 2, line 41 * * page 2, line 120 - page 4, line 50 *; | [A]US3734292 (BELL R) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 29 *; | [A]US4934907 (KROENER MARTIN [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract * * column 5, line 12 - line 15 *; | [A]US4181473 (INA YOSHIFUMI [JP]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4344777 |