EP1219272 - DISPOSABLE DIAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Satoshi Kao Corporation, Research Labs. 2606, Akabane Ichikai-machi Haga-gun Tochigi 321-3426 / JP | 02 /
MIYAHARA, Satoshi Kao Corporation, Research Labs. 2606, Akabane Ichikai-machi Haga-gun Tochigi 321-3426 / JP | 03 /
ARIMURA, Takahiro Kao Corporation, Research Labs. 2606, Akabane Ichikai-machi Haga-gun Tochigi 321-3426 / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/27] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00960986.8 | 13.09.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000JP06267 | Priority number, date | JP19990267743 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26774399 | [2002/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0121123 | Date: | 29.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1219272 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/56 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
A61F13/515 (EP);
A61F13/15203 (EP);
A61F13/539 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/27] | A61F13/49 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | WEGWERFWINDEL | [2002/27] | English: | DISPOSABLE DIAPER | [2002/27] | French: | COUCHE JETABLE | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2002 | Translation filed | 19.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/13] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0766548 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 6 - column 4, line 14 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 4 * * column 8, line 18 - line 25 *; | [X]EP0745433 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 3-5 * column 3, line 37 - line 56 *; | [X]EP0634466 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 39 - line 42; examples 2,5,7 *; | [X]EP0802251 (HERCULES INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 23 - line 35 * * page 6, line 29 - line 40 * * tables 1-3,5,6,9 *; | [X]WO9849249 (ATO FINDLEY INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 18 - line 33 *; | [L]US6533765 (BLANEY TED LEE [US], et al) [L] * column 7, line 11 - line 15 * * column 29, line 24 - line 42 * * table I * | International search | [X]JPH06170308 ; | [Y]JPH10225481 ; | [Y]JPH11506367 ; | [X]JPH08277382 ; | [X]JPH03160083 ; | [X]JPH09302319 ; | [X]JPH10510732 ; | [A]JPS5759805U ; | [A]JPH03165763 |