EP1207861 - TREATMENT OF FUNGAL INFECTIONS UTILIZING A FUNGAL GROWTH MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN Wolverine Tower, Room 2071, 3003 South State Street Ann Arbor, Michigan / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Michigan Wolverine Tower, Room 2071, 3003 South State Street Ann Arbor, Michigan / US | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIERARD, Gerald 402, rue du Sart Tilman B-4031 Angleur / BE | 02 /
PIERARD-FRANCHIMONT, Claudine 402, rue du Sart B-4031 Angleur / BE | 03 /
CAUWENBERGH, Geert 1 Stults Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 04 /
SUN, Ying 19 Woodville Terrace Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00961396.9 | 29.08.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000US23659 | Priority number, date | US19990151570P | 31.08.1999 Original published format: US 151570 P | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0115670 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1207861 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1207861 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
A61K9/7007 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/31] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PILZWACHSTUMSMEDIUM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PILZINFEKTIONEN | [2002/22] | English: | TREATMENT OF FUNGAL INFECTIONS UTILIZING A FUNGAL GROWTH MEDIUM | [2002/22] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS FONGIQUES AU MOYEN D'UN MILIEU DE PROLIFERATION FONGIQUE | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 29.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/20] | CY | 29.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS57209211 ; | [A]US5023082 (FRIEDMAN MICHAEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 06, Database accession no. 1983-13037k, XP002156352 & JPS57209211 A 19821222 (SHISEIDO) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [PX] - PIERARD, GERALD E.; ET AL., "The boosted oral antifungal treatment for onychomycosis beyond the regular itraconazole pulse dosing regimen", DERMATOLOGY, basel, (2000), vol. 200, no. 2, pages 185 - 187, XP000978145 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000018363 |