EP1331873 - MONITORING OF TOTAL AMMONIACAL CONCENTRATION IN BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardiox, Ltd. 4140 Tuller Road, Suite 104 Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [2003/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGERS, Philip, E. 5366 Reserve Drive Dublin, OH 43017 / US | 02 /
EGGERS, Andrew, R. 5330 U.S. Rt. 42 Ostrander, OH 43061 / US | 03 /
EGGERS, Eric, A. 1958 Guilford Road Columbus, OH 43221 / US | 04 /
HUNTLEY, Scott, P. 43 Fox Hill Road Wellesley Hills, MA 02481-2887 / US | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Machtalère, Georges, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Machtalère, Georges, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2006/04] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2003/32] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 00961553.5 | 01.09.2000 | [2003/32] | WO2000US24357 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0219904 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1331873 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
A61B5/14542 (EP,US);
A61B5/14539 (EP,US);
A61B5/1459 (EP);
A61B5/1473 (EP,US);
A61B5/412 (US);
G01N33/84 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG VON GESAMTAMMONIAKKONZENTRATION IM BLUT | [2003/32] | English: | MONITORING OF TOTAL AMMONIACAL CONCENTRATION IN BLOOD | [2003/32] | French: | CONTROLE DE LA CONCENTRATION TOTALE D'AMMONIAC DANS LE SANG | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 05.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.05.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   22.05.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0943289 (CARDIOX CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-27 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086]; figures 1-33; claims 1-62 * [Y] 3; | [Y]WO9837801 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 3 * page 8, line 32 - page 10, line 25; figures 1-36; claims 1-59 * | International search | [X]US4703756 (GOUGH DAVID A [US], et al); | [X]US4834101 (COLLISON MICHAEL E [US], et al); | [X]US5434084 (BURGESS JR LLOYD W [US]) |