EP1234235 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOTELY DEBUGGING COMPUTER SOFTWARE OVER A SERIAL BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2002/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRYSANTHAKOPOULOS, Georgios 17327 NE 25th Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
FULLER, John, Nels 24034 NE 29th Street Sammamish, WA 98053 / US | 03 /
RENERIS, Kenneth, S. 21816 NE 141st Street Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | [2002/49] |
Former [2002/46] | 01 /
CHRYSANTHAKOPOULOS, Georgios 715 7th Street South Kirkland, WA 98052 / US | ||
02 /
FULLER, John, Nels 24034 NE 29th Street Sammamish, WA 98053 / US | |||
03 /
RENERIS, Kenneth, S. 21816 NE 141st Street Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | |||
Former [2002/44] | 01 /
CHRYSANTHAKOPOULOS, Georgios 17327 NE 25th Way Redmond, WA 98052-6235 / US | ||
02 /
FULLER, John, Nels 24034 NE 29th Street Sammamish, WA 98053 / US | |||
03 /
RENERIS, Kenneth, S. 21816 NE 141st Street Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | |||
Former [2002/38] | 01 /
CHRYSANTHAKOPOULOS, Georgios 17327 NE 25th Way Redmond, WA 98052-6235 / US | ||
02 /
FULLER, John, Nels 24034 NE 29th Street Sammamish, WA 98053 / US | |||
03 /
RENERIS, Kenneth, S. 8 Red Gap Road Wilbraham, MA 01095 / US | |||
Former [2002/35] | 01 /
CHRYSANTHAKOPOULOS, Georgios 715 7th Street South Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | ||
02 /
FULLER, John, Nels 24034 NE 29th Street Sammamish, WA 98053 / US | |||
03 /
RENERIS, Kenneth, S. 8 Red Gap Road Wilbraham, MA 01095 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00961598.0 | 07.09.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000US24469 | Priority number, date | US19990168537P | 02.12.1999 Original published format: US 168537 P | US20000488015 | 20.01.2000 Original published format: US 488015 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0140940 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1234235 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1234235 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
H04L12/40058 (EP);
G06F11/362 (EP);
H04L12/40104 (EP);
H04L12/40123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FERNÜBERPRÜFUNG VON RECHNERSOFTWARE UND AUSSCHALTUNG VON FEHLERN | [2002/35] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOTELY DEBUGGING COMPUTER SOFTWARE OVER A SERIAL BUS | [2002/35] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DEBOGGAGE A DISTANCE D'UN LOGICIEL D'ORDINATEUR VIA UN BUS SERIE | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.03.2004 | BE | 24.03.2004 | CH | 24.03.2004 | CY | 24.03.2004 | FI | 24.03.2004 | IT | 24.03.2004 | LI | 24.03.2004 | NL | 24.03.2004 | DK | 24.06.2004 | GR | 24.06.2004 | SE | 24.06.2004 | ES | 05.07.2004 | PT | 24.08.2004 | IE | 07.09.2004 | LU | 07.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
CY | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
IT | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
IE | 07.09.2004 | ||
LU | 07.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
CY | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
IE | 07.09.2004 | ||
LU | 07.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
IE | 07.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
IE | 07.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
SE | 24.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5845152 (ANDERSON ERIC WERNER [US], et al) [Y] 2,8,9,14,20,21,26,27,29,30 * abstract * * column 4, line 18 - line 33 * * column 5, line 50 - line 56 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5911059 (PROFIT JR JACK H [US]) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * column 7, line 15 - line 48 * * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 61 * * figures 7,8 *; | [XY]US5978902 (MANN DANIEL P [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,13,15,17,18,25,28 * column 5, line 1 - column 5, line 52 * * column 6, line 10 - line 32 * * column 7, line 50 - line 56 * * column 8, line 48 - column 9, line 21 * * column 16, line 8 - line 22 * * figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 2,4,7-9,14,16,19-21,26,27,29,30; | [PX]US6094530 (BRANDEWIE DIRK J [US]) [PX] 1,2,5-7,12-14,17-19,24,25,28 * abstract * * column 1, line 20 - line 35 * * column 2, line 25 - line 39 * * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 5 ** figures 1,2 *; | [Y] - PROMOTERS OF THE 1394 OPEN HCI, "1394 open host controller interface specification", 1394 OPEN HOST CONTROLLER INTERFACE SPECIFICATION, no. 1.00draft, (19970929), pages 1 - 168, URL: //ftp.austin.ibm.com/pub/chrptech/1394ohci/draft100.pdf, (20010713), XP002172050 [Y] 4,7,16,19 * page 8 * * page 51 - page 53 * * page 73 - page 78 * |