EP1212227 - TRAILER AIR DRYER WITH BYPASS VALVING AND SERVICE INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bendix Commercial Vehicles Systems, LLC 901 Cleveland Street Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US | [2005/48] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC 901 Cleveland Street Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOENIG, James, P. 26915 Elizabeth Lane Olmsted, OH 44138 / US | 02 /
HOFFMAN, Fred 24540 Emmons Road Columbia Station, OH 44028 / US | 03 /
CONKLIN, Richard, J. 29101 Foote Road Bay Village, OH 44140 / US | 04 /
QUINN, Leonard 352 Carol Lane Elyria, OH 44035 / US | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00961959.4 | 18.09.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000US25527 | Priority number, date | US19990399285 | 17.09.1999 Original published format: US 399285 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0119657 | Date: | 22.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1212227 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212227 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/00 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
B60T17/004 (EP,US);
B01D53/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/24] | Title | German: | LUFTTROCKNER MIT BYPASSVENTILEN UND BETRIEBSANZEIGER FÜR EINEN ANHÄNGER | [2005/17] | English: | TRAILER AIR DRYER WITH BYPASS VALVING AND SERVICE INDICATOR | [2002/24] | French: | DESSICCATEUR D'AIR POUR REMORQUE A SOUPAPE DE DERIVATION ET INDICATEUR DE COLMATAGE | [2002/24] |
Former [2002/24] | ANHÄNGERLUFTTROCKNER MIT BYPASSVENTILEN UND BETRIEBSANZEIGER | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 22.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | CH | 30.11.2005 | CY | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | FR | 30.11.2005 | IT | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | SE | 28.02.2006 | ES | 13.03.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4238209 (LAPOINTE GABRIEL M [US]) [A] 1,12 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 49; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4336042 (FRANTZ VIRGIL L, et al) [A] 1,12 * column 3, line 3 - line 57; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0919275 (WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE CO [US]) [A] 1,12* column 6, line 25 - column 11, line 42; figures 1-7 * |