EP1317339 - A PRINT HEAD ASSEMBLY FOR A MODULAR COMMERCIAL PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERBROOK, Kia 393 Darling Street, Balmain New South Wales 2041 / AU | 02 /
KING, Tobin, Allen 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00962091.5 | 13.09.2000 | [2003/24] | WO2000AU01091 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0222365 | Date: | 21.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317339 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1317339 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/155 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
B41J2/155 (EP,KR);
B41J13/076 (EP);
B41J2/1637 (KR);
B41J2/175 (EP,KR);
B41J2002/14362 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKKOPFANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN KOMMERZIELLEN MODUALREN DRUCKER | [2003/24] | English: | A PRINT HEAD ASSEMBLY FOR A MODULAR COMMERCIAL PRINTER | [2003/24] | French: | ENSEMBLE TETE D'IMPRESSION POUR IMPRIMANTE COMMERCIALE MODULAIRE | [2003/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 25.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 09.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.06.2007 | BE | 27.06.2007 | CH | 27.06.2007 | CY | 27.06.2007 | DK | 27.06.2007 | FI | 27.06.2007 | IT | 27.06.2007 | LI | 27.06.2007 | NL | 27.06.2007 | LU | 13.09.2007 | SE | 27.09.2007 | DE | 28.09.2007 | GR | 28.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | ES | 08.10.2007 | PT | 27.11.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
CY | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
DE | 28.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
DE | 28.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
DE | 28.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | SE | 27.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4033816 (MESSMANN JOSEF FA [DE]) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]EP0620117 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, lines 39-52; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPH08332752 |