EP1267693 - TOILETTE PAPER MOISTENING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeusnik, Joachim Lohnergartenstrasse, 19 a 46354 Südlohn / DE | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEUSNIK, Joachim Lohnergartenstrasse 19a 46354 Südlohn / DE | 02 /
ZEUSNIK, Marion Lohnergartenstrasse 19a 46354 Südlohn / DE | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Schulte, Jörg Schulte & Schulte Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Schulte, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00962243.2 | 24.08.2000 | [2003/01] | WO2000DE02895 | Priority number, date | DE1999158753 | 07.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19958753 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0141614 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1267693 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1267693 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/32 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
A47K10/32 (EP);
A47K2010/3286 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOILETTENPAPIERBEFEUCHTER | [2003/01] | English: | TOILETTE PAPER MOISTENING DEVICE | [2003/01] | French: | HUMIDIFICATEUR DE PAPIER TOILETTE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 09.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.10.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | 22.10.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.10.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.03.2006 | FI | 22.03.2006 | IE | 22.03.2006 | DK | 22.06.2006 | GR | 23.06.2006 | ES | 03.07.2006 | PT | 22.08.2006 | AT | 24.08.2006 | LU | 24.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | CH | 31.08.2006 | LI | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 22.03.2006 | |
IE | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
AT | 24.08.2006 | ||
LU | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/29] | FI | 22.03.2006 | |
IE | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
AT | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | IE | 22.03.2006 | |
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
AT | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | IE | 22.03.2006 | |
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
AT | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | IE | 22.03.2006 | |
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | IE | 22.03.2006 | |
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | IE | 22.03.2006 | |
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | IE | 22.03.2006 | |
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | IE | 22.03.2006 | |
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | DK | 22.06.2006 | |
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | DK | 22.06.2006 | |
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | ES | 03.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3404164 (FLORJANCIC PETER [DE]) [A] 24* page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 33; figure . *; | [A]GB2168031 (WARREN JONATHAN SIDNEY) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29823674U (KOLLINGER RALF [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US3800494 | DE7715417U | DE2828163 | DE3409905 | DE3412069 | WO9208403 | DE4243408 | DE19630686 |