EP1218260 - CLOSURE FOR CREATING A VACUUM CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | Change - representative | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nunn, Peter Richard 92 Knightwood Crescent New Malden Surrey KT3 5JW / GB | For all designated states Everitt, Julian Donald 9 Wyndham street London W1H 1DB / GB | For all designated states Blandford, Michael Brian West Lodge, Littleworth Road Esher Surrey KT10 9PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Nunn, Peter Richard 92 Knightwood Crescent New Malden, Surrey KT3 5JW / GB | ||
For all designated states Everitt, Julian Donald 9 Wyndham street London W1H 1DB / GB | |||
For all designated states Blandford, Michael Brian West Lodge, Littleworth Road Esher, Surrey KT10 9PD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Moore, Christopher Mark Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Moore, Christopher Mark HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/45] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2002/27] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00962696.1 | 21.09.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000GB03612 | Priority number, date | GB19990022375 | 22.09.1999 Original published format: GB 9922375 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0121503 | Date: | 29.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1218260 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/20 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
B65D81/2038 (EP);
Y02W30/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSS ZUR SCHAFFUNG EINES VAKUUMGEEIGNETEN BEHÄLTERS | [2002/27] | English: | CLOSURE FOR CREATING A VACUUM CONTAINER | [2002/27] | French: | FERMETURE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE LE VIDE DANS UN RECIPIENT | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 30.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/43] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/43] | Request for further processing for: | 27.06.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXA]EP1020371 (MIYAKE MASAHARU [JP], et al) [PX] 1-7,12-15 * column 5, line 10 - column 11, line 31; figures 1-20 * [A] 8; | [PXA]US5957317 (LEE SHUN-CHICH [TW]) [PX] 1-7,10-15 * the whole document * [A] 8,9; | [A]US5558243 (CHU HUI-YING [TW]) [A] 8 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 14; figure - * |