EP1223975 - MUCOSAL DTPa VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT | [2009/21] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena SI / IT | ||
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Chiron S.r.l. Via Fiorentina, 1 53100 Siena / IT | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Chiron S.P.A. Via Fiorentina, 1 53100 Siena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAPPUOLI, Rino Chiron S.p.A., Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
PIZZA, Mariagrazia Chiron S.p.A., Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00962770.4 | 28.09.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000IB01440 | Priority number, date | GB19990023060 | 29.09.1999 Original published format: GB 9923060 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0122993 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1223975 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1223975 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/116, A61K39/39, A61K39/106, A61K39/108, A61P31/04 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K39/0018 (EP,US);
A61K39/05 (EP,US);
A61K39/08 (EP,US);
A61K39/099 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/541 (EP,US);
A61K2039/543 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55544 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Title | German: | MUKOSALE DTPA IMPFSTOFFE | [2002/30] | English: | MUCOSAL DTPa VACCINES | [2002/30] | French: | VACCINS DTPa POUR VACCINATION MUCOSALE | [2008/36] |
Former [2002/30] | VACCINS DTPA DES MUQUEUSES VACCINES | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 26.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0462534 (SCLAVO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 45 * * page 14, line 1 - line 43; table X * * claims 1-6,13,14 *; | [X]US5182109 (TAMURA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,8 * column 1, line 36 - line 43 * * column 2, line 29 - line 61 * * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 16 * * examples 5,15 * * claims 1-4 *; | [X]WO9321950 (MEDEVA HOLDINGS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,7-13 * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 2 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 8 * * claims 1-5,11-14,17-19 *; | [A]WO9702348 (BIOCINE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 2,12,13 * page 1, line 5 - line 16 * * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 2 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 13 * * page 47, line 23 - page 49, line 22 * * claims 1,4,10,11 *; | [Y] - RYAN E ET AL, "The adjuvant action of mutants of the heat labile toxin of E. coli for a nasally delivered acellular pertussis vaccine.", IMMUNOLOGY LETTERS, 10th International Congress of Mucosal Imunology;Amsterdam, Netherlands; June 27-July 1, 1999, (19990615), vol. 69, no. 1, ISSN 0165-2478, page 59, XP000982713 [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document * | [YD] - DEL GIUDICE GIUSEPPE ET AL, "Molecular basis of vaccination.", MOLECULAR ASPECTS OF MEDICINE, (199802), vol. 19, no. 1, ISSN 0098-2997, pages 1 - 70, XP002162795 [YD] 1-6,8-13 * page 23, line 29 - page 25, line 15 * * page 30, line 5 - line 9; table 2 * * page 33, line 8 - page 36, line 13 * * page 43, line 11 - page 46, line 39 * | [PX] - RYAN ELIZABETH J ET AL, "Mutants of Escherichia coli heat-labile toxin act as effective mucosal adjuvants for nasal delivery of an acellular pertussis vaccine: Differential effects of the nontoxic AB complex and enzyme activity on Th1 and Th2 cells.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (199912), vol. 67, no. 12, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 6270 - 6280, XP002162796 [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * |