EP1153938 - CATALYST FOR STEREOREGULAR POLYMERIZATION OF ALPHA-OLEFIN AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING STEREOREGULAR ALPHA-OLEFIN POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Masayuki 1-9-536, Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0125 / JP | 02 /
OGANE, Takuya 2-10-8, Fukuoudai Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0261 / JP | 03 /
SEKI, Yoshinori 1-9-346, Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0125 / JP | 04 /
FUJIWARA, Yasuki 6-18-21, Sugano Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-0824 / JP | 05 /
YADA, Kenichiro Yushuryoukita 220, 1-9, Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0125 / JP | 06 /
TASAKA, Masatada 1-9-943, Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0125 / JP | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00962839.7 | 25.09.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000JP06591 | Priority number, date | JP19990276372 | 29.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27637299 | [2001/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0123436 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153938 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/642, C08F110/06 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP);
C08F4/642 (KR);
C08F10/06 (EP);
C08F110/06 (EP);
C08F4/65912 (EP);
C08F4/65927 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/61916 (EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/65916 (EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/15, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/17 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | C08F4/64, C08F10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR ZUR STEREOREGULÄREN POLYMERISATION VON ALPHA-OLEFINEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STEREOREGULÄREM ALPHA-OLEFINPOLYMER | [2001/46] | English: | CATALYST FOR STEREOREGULAR POLYMERIZATION OF ALPHA-OLEFIN AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING STEREOREGULAR ALPHA-OLEFIN POLYMER | [2001/46] | French: | CATALYSEUR UTILE POUR LA POLYMERISATION STEREOREGULIERE D'ALPHA-OLEFINE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN POLYMERE D'ALPHA-OLEFINE STEREOREGULIER | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2001 | Translation filed | 29.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 24.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 09.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PXY]EP0949273 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PX] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * examples 1,10-12,16,18 * * claims 1,13,23,24 * * column 19, line 43 * * column 20, line 1 - line 6 * [PY] 5,11; | [X]DE19711304 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * examples 1,5,6 *; | [X]EP0821009 (DAELIM IND CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * example 3 * * claims 1-3,5 *; | [Y]US5594080 (WAYMOUTH ROBERT M [US], et al) [Y] 5,11 * examples 2,12 * * claims 15,21,27 *; | [DY]JP9510745T [DY] 5,11 | International search | [X]JPH11193306 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPH09249707 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [X]EP0821009 (DAELIM IND CO LTD [KR], et al); | [Y]US5594080 (WAYMOUTH ROBERT M [US], et al); | [A]JPH11269213 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]EP0208524 (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK [JP]) |