EP1216980 - CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND DRUGS CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa, 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINODA, Masanobu 4-1, Wakaba, Kukizakimachi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-1249 / JP | 02 /
EMORI, Eita 1-8-19-202, Namiki Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0061 / JP | 03 /
MATSUURA, Fumiyoshi 3-25-2-205, Matsushiro Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0035 / JP | 04 /
KANEKO, Toshihiko 1082-70, Taguumachi Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1236 / JP | 05 /
OHI, Norihito 1-12-7, Nanpeidai, Amimachi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-0312 / JP | 06 /
KASAI, Shunji 7-9-11, Matsumaedai, Moriyamachi Kitasouma-gun, Ibaraki 302-0102 / JP | 07 /
YOSHITOMI, Hideki Sorio Hanabatake 202, 2-11-2, Hanabatake Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-3261 / JP | 08 /
YAMAZAKI, Kazuto 3-304, 3-19-1, Azuma Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0031 / JP | 09 /
MIYASHITA, Sadakazu 1-35-19-2-402, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | 10 /
HIBARA, Taro Tsukubanedainiryo 306, 9-7, Inarimae Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0061 / JP | 11 /
SEIKI, Takashi Tsukubanedainiryo 406, 9-7, Inarimae Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0061 / JP | 12 /
CLARK, Richard 2-20-2, Ottominami Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0845 / JP | 13 /
HARADA, Hitoshi 2-24-27, Kamikashiwada Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1232 / JP | [2002/35] |
Former [2002/26] | 01 /
SHINODA, Masanobu 4-1, Wakaba, Kukizakimachi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-1249 / JP | ||
02 /
EMORI, Eita Tsukubanedainiryo 101, 9-7, Inarimae Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0061 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUURA, Fumiyoshi Green Palace Nakayama 205, 34-6, Higashiarai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0033 / JP | |||
04 /
KANEKO, Toshihiko 1082-70, Taguumachi Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1236 / JP | |||
05 /
OHI, Norihito 1-12-7, Nanpeidai, Amimachi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-0312 / JP | |||
06 /
KASAI, Shunji 7-9-11, Matsumaedai, Moriyamachi Kitasouma-gun, Ibaraki 302-0102 / JP | |||
07 /
YOSHITOMI, Hideki Sorio Hanabatake 202, 2-11-2, Hanabatake Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-3261 / JP | |||
08 /
YAMAZAKI, Kazuto 3-304, 3-19-1, Azuma Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0031 / JP | |||
09 /
MIYASHITA, Sadakazu 1-35-19-2-402, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | |||
10 /
HIBARA, Taro Tsukubanedainiryo 306, 9-7, Inarimae Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0061 / JP | |||
11 /
SEIKI, Takashi Tsukubanedainiryo 406, 9-7, Inarimae Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0061 / JP | |||
12 /
CLARK, Richard 2-20-2, Ottominami Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0845 / JP | |||
13 /
HARADA, Hitoshi 2-24-27, Kamikashiwada Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1232 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00962993.2 | 29.09.2000 | [2002/26] | WO2000JP06788 | Priority number, date | JP19990282079 | 01.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28207999 | JP19990369442 | 27.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36944299 | JP20000038795 | 16.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000038795 | JP20000104260 | 06.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000104260 | [2002/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0125181 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216980 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/66 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C233/51 (EP,US);
C07C233/55 (EP,US);
C07C233/87 (EP,US);
C07C235/34 (EP,US);
C07C235/38 (EP,US);
C07C235/52 (EP,US);
C07C235/60 (EP,US);
C07C235/78 (EP,US);
C07C235/84 (EP,US);
C07C255/57 (EP,US);
C07C59/66 (EP,US);
C07C59/68 (EP,US);
C07D209/14 (EP,US);
C07D209/42 (EP,US);
C07D213/55 (EP,US);
C07D213/56 (EP,US);
C07D213/81 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07D215/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D217/26 (EP,KR,US);
C07D231/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D233/90 (EP,KR,US);
C07D239/52 (EP,KR,US);
C07D241/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07D261/18 (EP,KR,US);
C07D263/26 (EP,KR,US);
C07D263/32 (EP,US);
C07D277/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D277/30 (EP,US);
C07D277/34 (EP,US);
C07D277/56 (EP,US);
C07D307/54 (EP,US);
C07D307/79 (EP,US);
C07D333/24 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/26] | Title | German: | CARBONSÄUREDERIVATE UND MEDIKAMENTE, DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN | [2002/26] | English: | CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND DRUGS CONTAINING THE SAME | [2002/26] | French: | DERIVES D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE ET MEDICAMENTS LES CONTENANT | [2002/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2002 | Translation filed | 13.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 13.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9920275 (RHONE POULENC RORER PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-17 * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 13; page 16, line 11 - page page 18, line 3; page 99, 1st compound *; | [X]WO9736862 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,11 * page 4, line 18 - page 11, line 7; examples 1, 2, 4-10, 12-16, 19-26, 28-44, 46-51, 53-65, 67, 69, 70, 75-84, 90, 91, 94, 95, 97-99, 102 *; | [X]DE3026402 (SYNTEX CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9,11 * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 20; page 8, lines 4, 14, 29, 34 *; | JPS5764655 [ ] (NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [X]EP0516069 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * page 3, line 40 - page 5, line 16; examples 2-8, 13, 15-23, 25-32, 35, 37-41, 43-50, 53-70, 73-82, 85-100, 103-112, 117-120, 122-125, 127-139 *; | [X]GB1465661 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6,9,11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9919300 (PFIZER [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,11 * page 4, line 1 - page 8, line 24; page 21, line 29 - page 26, line 4; examples 1b-1w, 1ad-1am, 2-2c, 9-9c, 11a-11b, 11d-11e, 11h, 11m-11z, 12a-12b, 12f-12z, 15a-15b, 15d-15g, 16a *; | [X]WO9631492 (TEXAS BIOTECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,11 * page 20, line 1 - page 21, line 26; page 262, lines 27-29; page 265, lines 10-11 *; | [X]EP0763524 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [X] 1,4-7,10,11 * page 3, line 29 - page 6, line 30; table 1, e.g. compounds 38-45 *; | [X]CH480070 (EPROVA AG [CH]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 9, lines 21-22; column 10, lines 29-30, 63-64; column 11, lines 30-31; column 12, lines 1-2, column 14, lines 44-45 *; | [Y]EP0846693 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [Y] 1-7,9-17 * page 2, lines 5-49; examples 14-51 *; | WO9638428 [ ] (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP], et al); | [E]EP1213287 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [E] 1,4-8,10-17 * page 3, lines 10-31; examples 5, 6, 23 *; | [E]EP1184366 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [E] 1-6,9-17 * the whole document, in particular examples 8-46, 49-141, 152-153, 158-159, 161, 174-197 * | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1982), Database accession no. 1982:491971, URL: STN, XP002602130 [X] 1-7,9-11 * abstract; RN 64198-92-1, 82693-43-4, 82693-44-5, 82693-45-6, 82693-49-0, 82693-50-3, 82693-52-5 * | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1963), Database accession no. 1963:435633, URL: STN, XP002602131 [X] 1-5,7,9,11 * abstract; RN 100087-40-9, 100173-40-8, 100089-37-0, 100149-63-1 * | [ ] - H. BOJARSKA-DAHLIG ET AL, CONGR. SCI. FARM., CONF COMMUN., 21, PISA, (1962), pages 203 - 209 | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1987), Database accession no. 1987:477384, URL: STN, XP002602132 [X] 1-5,9-11 * abstract; RN 22161-81-5, 109679-89-2, 109679-90-5, 109679-85-8, 109679-86-9, 109718-57-2, 109718-58-3, 47087-07-0, 56105-81-8, 22071-15-4 * | [ ] - J.W. KIM ET AL, ARCHIVES OF PHARMACAL RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 25 - 28 | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1995), Database accession no. 1995:478516, URL: STN, XP002602133 [X] 1-6,9,10 * abstract; RN 163433-43-0, 163433-44-1, 163433-45-2, 163433-46-3 * | [ ] - H.D. CHOI ET AL, YAKHAK HOECHI, (1994), vol. 38, no. 5, pages 504 - 510 | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1991), Database accession no. 1991:622671, URL: STN, XP002602389 [X] 1,4,6-8 * RN 137103-47-0 * | [ ] - H.G. FOUDA ET AL, XENOBIOTICA, (1991), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 925 - 934 | [YD] - D.R. BUCKLE ET AL, BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (19960903), vol. 6, no. 17, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2121 - 2126, XP004135669 [YD] 1-7,9-17 * the whole document, in particular page 2124, last paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0960-894X(96)00383-6 | International search | [X]WO9920275 (RHONE POULENC RORER PHARMA [US], et al); | [X]WO9919300 (PFIZER [US], et al); | [X]EP0763524 (SANKYO CO [JP]); | [X]EP0516069 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]); | [X]GB1436502 (GALLARDO ANTONIO SA); | [X]WO9631492 (TEXAS BIOTECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al); | [X]EP0911025 (SSP CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO9736862 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) |