EP1214706 - MULTIMODE SPEECH ENCODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mindspeed Technologies, Inc. 4000 MacArthur Blvd., East Tower Newport Beach, CA 92660-3095 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Mindspeed Technologies, Inc. 4000 MacArthur Blvd., East Tower Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | ||
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Conexant Systems, Inc. 4311 Jamboree Road Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | ||
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Conexant Systems, Inc. IP Dept. 510-900, 4311 Jamboree Road Newport Beach, California 92660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Yang 26586 San Torini Road Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | 02 /
BENYASSINE, Adil 40 Dinuba Irvine, CA 92602 / US | 03 /
THYSSEN, Jes 7 Novilla Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 04 /
SHOLOMOT, Eyal 216 Quincy Ave., No. 1 Long Beach, CA 90803 / US | 05 /
SU, Huan-yu 3009 Calle Frontera San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | [2002/41] |
Former [2002/25] | 01 /
GAO, Yang 26586 San Torini Road Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | ||
02 /
BENYASSINE, Adil 1305 Reggio Aisle Irvine, CA 92606 / US | |||
03 /
THYSSEN, Jes 96 Chandon Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | |||
04 /
SHOLOMOT, Eyal 216 Quincy Ave., No. 1 Long Beach, CA 90803 / US | |||
05 /
SU, Huan-yu 3009 Calle Frontera San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Wagner & Geyer Intellectual Property Attorneys Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2002/25] | Hanna, Peter William Derek Peter Hanna Associates 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00963447.8 | 15.09.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000US25182 | Priority number, date | US19990155321P | 22.09.1999 Original published format: US 155321 P | US20000574396 | 19.05.2000 Original published format: US 574396 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0122402 | Date: | 29.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214706 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1214706 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1214706 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/14 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
G10L19/167 (EP);
G10L19/18 (KR);
G10L19/00 (US);
G10L19/24 (EP,KR);
H03G3/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/32] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIMODALER SPRACHKODIERER | [2002/25] | English: | MULTIMODE SPEECH ENCODER | [2002/25] | French: | CODEUR VOCAL MULTIMODE | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2004 | BE | 04.08.2004 | CH | 04.08.2004 | CY | 04.08.2004 | FI | 04.08.2004 | IT | 04.08.2004 | LI | 04.08.2004 | NL | 04.08.2004 | IE | 15.09.2004 | LU | 15.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | DK | 04.11.2004 | GR | 04.11.2004 | SE | 04.11.2004 | ES | 15.11.2004 | PT | 04.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
CY | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IT | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
NL | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
LU | 15.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
CY | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
NL | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
LU | 15.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
NL | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 04.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5911128 (DEJACO ANDREW P [US]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 50 - line 60 * * column 11, line 44 - line 46 *; | [YP]CA2239294 (FOODEEI MAJID [CA]) [YP] 2 * page 4, line 23 - line 30 * * page 6, line 14 - line 30 ** page 13, line 12 - line 16 *; | [X] - CELLARIO L ET AL, "CELP CODING AT VARIABLE RATE", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES,IT,AEI, MILANO, (19940901), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 1120-3862, pages 69 - 79, XP000470681 [X] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraph [04.3] * | [XY] - OZAWA K ET AL, "M-LCELP SPEECH CODING AT 4 KB/S WITH MULTI-MODE AND MULTI-CODEBOOK", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,JP,INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, (19940901), vol. E77B, no. 9, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 1114 - 1121, XP000474108 [X] 3 * figure 1 * * page 1115 "6) Gain quantization" * * idem * [Y] 2 |