EP1268481 - KINASE INHIBITORS AS THERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2006/30] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRST, Gavin, C. 112 Robert Road Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | 02 /
RITTER, Kurt Hamburger Allee 50 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
RAFFERTY, Paul 722 Charlestown Drive Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 04 /
ST.GALLAY, Stephen Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leics. LE11 5RH / GB | 05 /
CALDERWOOD, David 4 McCarthy Circle Framingham, MA 01702 / US | 06 /
TWIGGER, Helen, L. R5 Pennyfoot Street Nottingham, NG1 1GF / GB | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/01] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00963510.3 | 15.09.2000 | [2003/01] | WO2000US25357 | Priority number, date | US19990154618P | 17.09.1999 Original published format: US 154618 P | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0119828 | Date: | 22.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1268481 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268481 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D471/04, C07D491/04, C07D498/04, A61K31/519, A61K31/5025, A61K31/4353, A61K31/551, A61P35/00, // (C07D487/04, 239:00), C07D209:00,(C07D487/04, 237:00), C07D209:00,(C07D471/04, 231:00), C07D221:00,(C07D487/04, 243:00), C07D239:00 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR);
C07D487/04 (EP,KR);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | 25.03.2002 | LT | 25.03.2002 | LV | 25.03.2002 | MK | 25.03.2002 | RO | 25.03.2002 | SI | 25.03.2002 | Title | German: | KINASEINHIBITOREN ALS ARZNEIMITTEL | [2003/01] | English: | KINASE INHIBITORS AS THERAPEUTIC AGENTS | [2003/01] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE KINASE UTILISES COMME AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 28.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 08.02.2005 | Appeal received | 13.04.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.05.2005 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9841525 (KNOLL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,33 * claims 1,28 *; | [AP]WO0044728 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [AP] 1,33* claims 1,30 * |