EP1214633 - PROCESS TRANSMITTER WITH ORTHOGONAL-POLYNOMIAL FITTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT INC. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2002/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEVEN, Lowell, A. 7952 Southbay Curve Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US | 02 /
TEWFIK, Ahmed, H. 7317 Oaklawn Avenue Edina, MN 55435 / US | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00963693.7 | 22.09.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000US25923 | Priority number, date | US19990405196 | 24.09.1999 Original published format: US 405196 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0123972 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214633 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1214633 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1214633 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G05B19/418, G05B19/042 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
G01F1/42 (EP,US);
G01F25/10 (EP,US);
G05B19/0423 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31126 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34084 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34142 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37401 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/25] | G05B23/02, G05B19/418 | Designated contracting states | DE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | PROZESSSENDER MIT ORTHOGONALER-POLYNOMIALER ANPASSUNG | [2002/25] | English: | PROCESS TRANSMITTER WITH ORTHOGONAL-POLYNOMIAL FITTING | [2002/25] | French: | CAPTEUR DE MESURE DE PROCESSUS APPROXIMANT UNE VARIABLE AVEC UN POLYNOME ORTHOGONAL | [2009/15] |
Former [2002/25] | EMETTEUR DE MESURE DE VARIABLE DE PROCESSUS, A AJUSTEMENT ORTHOGONAL-POLYNOMIAL | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 03.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.02.2005
23.02.2005
ADMISSIBLE Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.02.2005
23.02.2005
ADMISSIBLE Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.02.2005
23.02.2005
ADMISSIBLE ENDRESS + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Andres, Angelika Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | 18.03.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.09.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.02.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.06.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5606513 (LOUWAGIE BENNETT L [US], et al) [DA] 1,22,29,37,42-44 * column 4, line 29 - column 8, line 55 *; | [DA]WO9704288 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [DA] 1,22,29,37,42-44 * page 16, line 8 - page 24, line 29 *; | [A] - GHOSH D ET AL, "LINEARIZATION OF TRANSDUCERS THROUGH A GENERALIZED SOFTWARE TECHNIQUE", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY,GB,IOP PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, (1991), vol. 2, ISSN 0957-0233, pages 102 - 105, XP000208229 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/2/2/002 | [A] - P.MAHANA ET AL, "TRANSDUCER OUTPUT SIGNAL PROCESSING USING AN EIGHT-BIT MICROCOMPUTER", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, USA, (198606), no. 2, pages 182 - 186, XP000960883 | Examination | US5772323 | Opposition | EP0421394 | - I. N. BRONSTEIN, K. A. SEMENDJAJEW, Taschenbuch der Mathematik, 25. durchgesehene Auflage, STUTTGART - LEIPZIG, B. G. TEUBNER VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, (1991), pages 749 - 753, ISBN 3815420008 | - D. SCOTT HOLMES, S. SCOTT COURTS, "Resolution and Accuracy of Cryogenic Temperature Measurements", OMEGA'S TEMPERATURE HANDBOOK, Z-SECTION, URL: WWW.OMEGA.COM, (19990512), pages Z-94 - Z-99 | - O. Machul: "Nichtlineare Approximationsmethoden zur Reduzierung nichtidealer Sensoreigenschaften in integrierten CMOS-Sensorsystemen", Dissertation, Fachbereich Elektrotechnik der Gerhard-Mercator-Universität - Gesamthochschule Duisburg, 1999 | - MOTOROLA INC., "PowerPC 603e, RISC Microprocessor User's Manual with Supplement for PowerPC 603 Microprocessor", USA, (199509), page 1-1 | - WILLIAM H. PRESS ET AL., Numerical Recipes in Pascal - The Art of Scientific Computing, CAMBRIDGE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1992), pages 165 - 170, ISBN 0521375169 |