EP1208700 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING SIGNALING INFORMATION IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREYENBERG, Christian Johann-Pischeltsrieder-Weg 6 82057 Icking / DE | [2002/22] | Application number, filing date | 00963918.8 | 22.08.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000DE02860 | Priority number, date | DE1999141143 | 30.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19941143 | [2002/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0117312 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1208700 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208700 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/545 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0435 (EP);
H04Q3/54566 (EP);
H04Q2213/13034 (EP);
H04Q2213/1305 (EP);
H04Q2213/13109 (EP);
H04Q2213/13174 (EP);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP);
H04Q2213/13209 (EP);
H04Q2213/13256 (EP);
H04Q2213/13282 (EP);
H04Q2213/13389 (EP);
H04Q2213/13396 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERARBEITEN VON SIGNALISIERUNGSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2002/22] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING SIGNALING INFORMATION IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2002/22] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS DE SIGNALISATION DANS UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATION | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5673261 (TJABBEN HERMANN [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 27 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 14 * * column 7, lines 17-28 * [A] 2,7,9,10; | [X]WO9724885 (MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-6,8 * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 16 * * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 4 * * page 20, line 15 - page 21, line 16 *; | [X]US5461669 (VILAIN BERNARD [FR]) [X] 1,3-6,8 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 7 * * column 5, lines 1-46 * * column 6, lines 28-50 *; | [X]EP0697796 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,8 * column 1, lines 35-59 * * column 5, lines 21-42 * |