EP1224204 - NON-AROMATIC ESTROGENIC STEROIDS WITH A HYDROCARBON SUBSTITUENT IN POSITION 11 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2002/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOOZEN, Hubert, Jan, Jozef Meerhoek 602 NL-5403 AC Uden / NL | 02 /
VEENEMAN, Gerrit, Herman Smidse 6 NL-5374 AJ Schaijk / NL | 03 /
SCHOONEN, Wilhelmus, Gerardus, Eduardus, Joseph Parklaan 16 NL-5345 BV Oss / NL | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Kraak, Hajo, et al N.V. Organon Global Patent Department P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Kraak, Hajo, et al N.V. Organon Global Patent Department P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | ||
Former [2002/30] | Kraak, Hajo, et al P.O. Box 20, Wethouder van Eschstraat 1 5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 00964053.3 | 28.08.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000EP08406 | Priority number, date | EP19990202900 | 06.09.1999 Original published format: EP 99202900 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0118027 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224204 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1224204 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07J1/00, A61K31/565, C07J71/00, C07J51/00 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
C07J1/0059 (EP,US);
C07J1/00 (KR);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P5/30 (EP);
A61P5/32 (EP);
C07J1/007 (EP,US);
C07J1/0096 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHT-AROMATISCHE ESTROGENISCHE STEROIDE MIT EINEM 11-HYDROCARBYL SUBSTITUENT | [2002/30] | English: | NON-AROMATIC ESTROGENIC STEROIDS WITH A HYDROCARBON SUBSTITUENT IN POSITION 11 | [2002/30] | French: | STEROIDES OESTROGENIQUES NON AROMATIQUES POSSEDANT UN SUBSTITUANT HYDROCARBURE EN POSITION 11 | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 28.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19] | Request for further processing for: | 09.09.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2005 | BE | 18.05.2005 | FI | 18.05.2005 | DK | 18.08.2005 | GR | 18.08.2005 | CY | 28.08.2005 | IE | 29.08.2005 | LU | 31.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | PT | 24.10.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
IE | 29.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
IE | 29.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 18.05.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3092645 (NICHOLSON ROBERT T) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 63 - line 66; examples 2,3 *; | [Y]US3377366 (BARAN JOHN S) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 28 - line 31; examples 2-5 *; | [Y]US3465010 (BARAN JOHN S) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 41 - line 44; examples 1-3,6-13 *; | [Y]US3464979 (BARTON DEREK HAROLD RICHARD) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 39 - line 41; example 8 *; | [Y]US3652606 (BARAN JOHN S, et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 51 - line 59; examples 3-5 *; | [Y]EP0145493 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 10, paragraph 4; example 21 *; | [Y]WO9418224 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-5 * page 6, paragraph 2; example 8 *; | [Y]EP0613687 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [Y] 1-5 * page 2, paragraph 4; example 3 *; | [PY]WO9945886 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [PY] 1-5* page 3, paragraph 2; example 5 * |