EP1220812 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR USE IN HANDLING A LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEEP TEK LIMITED Kilburns House, Newport-on-Tay Fife DD6 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states DEEP TEK LIMITED Kilburns House, Newport-on-Tay Fife DD6 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states DEEP TEK LIMITED Kilburns House, Newport-on-Tray Fife DD6 8 PL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAWFORD, Alec, Kilburns House Newport-on-Tay Fife DD6 8PL / GB | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Allan, James Stewart, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | Allan, James Stewart, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00964468.3 | 03.10.2000 | [2002/28] | WO2000GB03769 | Priority number, date | GB19990023345 | 05.10.1999 Original published format: GB 9923345 | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0125130 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1220812 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1220812 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/14 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
B66C13/14 (EP,US);
Y10S414/131 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/21] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANWENDEN IN DER HANDHABUNG EINER LAST | [2002/28] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR USE IN HANDLING A LOAD | [2002/28] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE MANIPULATION D'UNE CHARGE | [2002/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 12.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2003 | BE | 21.05.2003 | CH | 21.05.2003 | FI | 21.05.2003 | LI | 21.05.2003 | GR | 21.08.2003 | PT | 21.08.2003 | CY | 03.10.2003 | IE | 03.10.2003 | LU | 03.10.2003 | MC | 31.10.2003 | [2005/03] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
CY | 03.10.2003 | ||
LU | 03.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
CY | 03.10.2003 | ||
LU | 03.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
CY | 03.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9622935 (DEEP WATER RECOVERY & EXPLORAT [GB], et al) [A] 1,16 * abstract *; | [AP]DE19820037 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |