EP1221047 - ADDRESSABLE ARRAYS USING MORPHOLOGY DEPENDENT RESONANCE FOR ANALYTE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | Change - classification | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | 03.12.2004 | Change - classification | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Array Bioscience Corporation 4703 Tidewater Avenue, Suite F Oakland California 94601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states Array Bioscience Corporation 4703 Tidewater Avenue, Suite F Oakland, California 94601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEVIN, Oleg, A. 1364 Creekside Dive Apartment 4 Walnut Creek, CA / US | 02 /
KREIMER, David, I. 1841 Dwight Way Berkeley, CA 94703 / US | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00965441.9 | 26.09.2000 | [2002/28] | WO2000US26413 | Priority number, date | US19990156195P | 27.09.1999 Original published format: US 156195 P | US19990156145P | 27.09.1999 Original published format: US 156145 P | US19990156471P | 27.09.1999 Original published format: US 156471 P | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0123888 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1221047 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/542, G01N21/55, G01N21/25 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
G01N33/54346 (EP,US);
F28D15/02 (EP,KR);
B01J13/0008 (EP);
B01J13/0043 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
F24S70/10 (EP);
F28D15/04 (EP);
G01N33/54366 (EP);
G01N33/54373 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2002/28] | G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/28] | Title | German: | ADRESSIERBARE ARRAYS MIT MORPHOLOGISCH ABHÄNGIGER RESONANZ ZUM ANALYTNACHWEIS | [2002/28] | English: | ADDRESSABLE ARRAYS USING MORPHOLOGY DEPENDENT RESONANCE FOR ANALYTE DETECTION | [2002/28] | French: | RESEAUX ADRESSABLES UTILISANT LA RESONANCE DEPENDANT DE LA MORPHOLOGIE POUR LA DETECTION D'ANALYTES | [2002/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 01.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5814565 (REICHERT W MONTY [US], et al) |