EP1225984 - AN ARRAY OF CAPACITIVE MICROMACHINED ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER ELEMENTS WITH THROUGH WAFER VIA CONNECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of The Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | ||
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY 900 Welch Road, Suite 350 Palo Alto, CA 94304-1850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHURI-YAKUB, Butrus, T. 4151 Donald Drive Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
DEGERTEKIN, F., Levent 300 Murchinson Drive, Apt. 205 Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | 03 /
CALMES, Sam 2250 Latham Street, Apt. 11 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 04 /
JIN, Xuecheng 71B Escondido Village Standford, CA 94305 / US | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00965529.1 | 29.09.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000US26852 | Priority number, date | US19990158254P | 30.09.1999 Original published format: US 158254 P | US20000667203 | 21.09.2000 Original published format: US 667203 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0123105 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1225984 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225984 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/02 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
H01L21/76898 (EP,US);
B06B1/0292 (EP,US);
H01L23/481 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05568 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05573 (EP,US);
H01L2224/131 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | EINE ANORDNUNG KAPAZITIVER, MIKROMECHANISCHER ULTRASCHALLWANDLERELEMENTE MIT DURCHKONTAKTIERUNG DURCH DAS TRÄGERSUBSTRAT | [2002/31] | English: | AN ARRAY OF CAPACITIVE MICROMACHINED ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER ELEMENTS WITH THROUGH WAFER VIA CONNECTIONS | [2002/31] | French: | RESEAU D'ELEMENTS DE TRANSDUCTEUR ULTRASONIQUE MICRO-USINE CAPACITIF COMPRENANT DES TROUS D'INTERCONNEXION FORMES SUR UNE TRANCHE | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2721471 (SCHLUMBERGER IND SA [FR]) [A] 1-5 * page 13, line 15 - line 32 * * page 18, line 6 - line 26 * * figure 24; claim 1 *; | [AD]US5619476 (HALLER MATTHEW I [US], et al) [AD] 1,2 * column 3, line 40 - line 45 ** figures 1A-D; claim 1 *; | [XP] - CALMES, CHENG, DEGERTEKIN, JIN, ERGUN, KHURI-YAKUB, "Highly integrated 2-D capacative micromachined ultrasonic transducers", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, (199910), vol. 1, pages 1163 - 1166, XP002157421 [XP] 1-4 * page 1, column 2 - page 2, column 4; figure 1 * |