EP1133841 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPENSATING TIMING ERRORS USING PILOT SYMBOLS IN A OFDM/CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/38] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPENSATING TIMING ERROR USING PILOT SYMBOL IN OFDM/CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
[2007/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-shi Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-shi Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-shi, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hye-Jeong Wooseong APT.228-1506, Sohyon-dong, Puntang-gu Songnam-shi, Kyonggi-do 463-050 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Hyun-Kyu 263, Sohyon-dong, Puntang-gu, Songnam-shi Kyonggi-do 463-050 / KR | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00966559.7 | 29.09.2000 | [2001/38] | WO2000KR01089 | Priority number, date | KR19990041669 | 29.09.1999 Original published format: KR 9941669 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0124410 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133841 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1133841 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/208, H04B7/26 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
H04L27/2662 (EP,US);
H04B7/208 (KR);
H04L27/2675 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L27/2656 (EP,US);
H04L27/2657 (EP,US);
H04L5/0016 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/38] | H04B7/208 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPENSATION VON ZEITFEHLERN DURCH VERWENDUNG VON PILOTSYMBOLS IN EINEM OFDM/CDMA KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2007/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPENSATING TIMING ERRORS USING PILOT SYMBOLS IN A OFDM/CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2007/42] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CORRECTION D'ERREURS DE SYNCHRONISATION PAR UTILISATION DE SYMBOLES PILOTES DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION OFDM/CDMA | [2007/42] |
Former [2001/38] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPENSATION VON ZEITFEHLERN DURCH EIN PILOTSYMBOL IN EINEM OFDM/CDMA KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2001/38] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPENSATING TIMING ERROR USING PILOT SYMBOL IN OFDM/CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2001/38] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CORRECTION D'ERREUR DE SYNCHRONISATION PAR UTILISATION D'UN SYMBOLE PILOTE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION OFDM/CDMA | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 26.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YX]US5732068 (TAKAHASHI NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 5, line 12 - column 11, line 15; figures 3,5 * [X] 8-14; | [YA]EP0810742 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * claim 1 * [A] 8-14; | [A]US5629929 (BLANCHARD SCOTT D [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 2,3; claims 1-15 *; | [A]US5341397 (GUDMUNDSON BJORN [SE]) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 18 *; | [A]EP0940937 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claims 1-15 * | International search | [A]US5732068 (TAKAHASHI NOBUAKI [JP], et al); | [A]JPH1051354 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) |