EP1218723 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SPECTROMETRIC ANALYSIS OF TURBID, PHARMACEUTICAL SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2002/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLESTAD, Staffan AstraZeneca R & D Mölndal S-431 83 Mölndal / SE | 02 /
JOSEFSON, Mats AstraZeneca R & D Mölndal S-431 83 Mölndal / SE | 03 /
SPAREN, Anders AstraZeneca R & D-Mölndal S-431 83 R & D Mölndal / SE | 04 /
JOHANSSON, Jonas AstraZeneca R & D Mölndal S-431 83 Mölndal / SE | [2002/27] | Application number, filing date | 00966625.6 | 18.09.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000SE01799 | Priority number, date | SE19990003423 | 22.09.1999 Original published format: SE 9903423 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0122063 | Date: | 29.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1218723 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/35, G01N33/15, G01N21/25 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
G01N21/47 (EP,US);
G01N21/25 (KR);
G01J3/4412 (EP,US);
G01N21/3563 (EP,US);
G01N21/532 (EP,US);
G01N21/534 (EP,US);
G06V20/66 (EP);
G01N2021/399 (EP,US);
G01N21/33 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 22.04.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPEKTROMETRISCHEN ANALYSE VON TRÜBEN PHARMAZEUTISCHEN PROBEN | [2002/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SPECTROMETRIC ANALYSIS OF TURBID, PHARMACEUTICAL SAMPLES | [2002/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ANALYSE SPECTROMETRIQUE D'ECHANTILLONS PHARMACEUTIQUES TROUBLES | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2009 | 17.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/15] | 05.12.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0727671 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [A]EP0841548 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]US5760399 (TRYGSTAD W MARCUS [US]); |