EP1224822 - A PORTABLE COMMUNICATION APPARATUS HAVING A MAN-MACHINE INTERFACE AND A METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIESSLING, Johan Rödabergsbrinken 16 S-113 30 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
ARWALD, Jan Drevkarlstigen 1 S-192 53 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
NILSSON, Bernt Ölmegatan 3A S-652 30 Karlstad / SE | 04 /
SAXEN, Benny Kyrkvärdsvägen 32 S-665 33 Kil / SE | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Petri, Stellan, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Petri, Stellan, et al Ström & Gulliksson IPC AB, P.O. Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 00966632.2 | 19.09.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000SE01807 | Priority number, date | SE19990003560 | 01.10.1999 Original published format: SE 9903560 | SE20000001996 | 26.05.2000 Original published format: SE 0001996 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0126401 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224822 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1224822 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, H04L29/06, H04Q7/38 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
H04L2463/102 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/30] | H04Q7/32, H04L29/06, // H04Q7:38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT MENSCH-MASCHINE SCHNITTSTELLE UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEREN BETRIEB | [2002/30] | English: | A PORTABLE COMMUNICATION APPARATUS HAVING A MAN-MACHINE INTERFACE AND A METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION | [2002/30] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION PORTATIF DOTE D'UNE INTERFACE HOMME-MACHINE ET SON PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2006 | BE | 02.08.2006 | CH | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | LI | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | IE | 19.09.2006 | LU | 19.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 19.09.2006 | ||
LU | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
LI | 02.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5461372 (BUSAK STEVEN J [US], et al); | [A] - P. BURGE ET AL., "Fraud detection and management in mobile telecommunications networks", EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SECURITY AND DETECTION, (19970428), no. 437, pages 91 - 96, XP002085420 | [AP] - VAN THANH D., TJOA A.M. ET AL., DATABASE AND EXPERT SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS, 20 PROCEEDINGS, 11TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, pages 412 - 425, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/ie15/7035/18943/00875060.pdf, (20010202), XP010515528 |