EP1220673 - MORPHOLINOL DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF OBESITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTHEWS, Jessica E, c/o Glaxo Wellcome Inc. Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 02 /
MUSSO, David Lee, c/o Glaxo Smith Kline Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 277 09 / US | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Dolton, Peter Irving Ernest, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | Dolton, Peter Irving Ernest, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00967281.7 | 03.10.2000 | [2002/28] | WO2000US27252 | Priority number, date | GB19990024275 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: GB 9924275 | GB20000001861 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0001861 | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0126641 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1220673 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5375, A61P3/04 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/5375 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MORPHOLINOL-VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FETTLEIBIGKEIT | [2002/28] | English: | MORPHOLINOL DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF OBESITY | [2002/28] | French: | METHODE DESTINEE AU TRAITEMENT DE L'OBESITE | [2002/28] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/38] | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0018406 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-17 * page 2, lines 27,28 * * example - *; | [DX]EP0426416 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [DX] 17 * example 2 *; | [X]WO9925355 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 17 * page - *; | [Y]WO9937305 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-17 * Compound N. I;; claims 5,6 *; | [A]WO9847513 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * See compounds with formula I-IV; page 27 * | [Y] - KELLEY JAMES L ET AL, "-2-(3,5-difluorophenyl)-3,5-dimethyl-2-morpholinol: A novel antidepressant agent and selective inhibitor of norepinephrine uptake.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 39, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 347 - 349, XP002164358 [Y] 1-17 * Scheme 1;; figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm950630p |