EP1210391 - PAVEMENT PATCH MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crafco Inc. 420 North Roosevelt Avenue Chandler, AZ 85226 / US | [2002/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEHOVITS, James, G. 4515 E. Elmwood Street Mesa, AZ 85205 / US | 02 /
PARKISON, Robert, Lowel 476 E. Windsor Drive Gilbert, AZ 85296 / US | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00967401.1 | 15.08.2000 | [2002/23] | WO2000US40653 | Priority number, date | US19990384119 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: US 384119 | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0116233 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1210391 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, E01C7/18 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/08 (US,EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/74 (US,EP);
C08L95/00, C08L53/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2002/23] | C08L95/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRASSENBELAG-FLICKMATERIAL | [2002/23] | English: | PAVEMENT PATCH MATERIAL | [2002/23] | French: | ENROBE DE RAPIE AGE POUR STRUCTURE DE CHAUSSEE | [2002/23] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 02.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2004 | 31.08.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YP]US4745155 (GROSSI ANTHONY V [US]); | [YP]US5888279 (SALMONSEN STEVEN TODD [US], et al); | [YP]US5719215 (LIANG ZHI-ZHONG [CA], et al); | [YP]US4833184 (HIGGINS WILLIAM A [US]); | [Y] - "EXPANDED SHALE, CLAY & SLATE A WORLD OF APPLICATIONS ... WORLDWIDE", EXPANDED SHALE, CLAY AND SLATE. A WORLD OF APPLICATIONS WORLDWIDE, XX, XX, XX, (19950101), pages 01 - 06, XP002935727 |