EP1212743 - JAW MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oestreich, Gerd Urb el Maquilishuat Calle Jacaranda Pasaje PG J4 / SV | [2002/30] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Oestreich, Gerd Wilhelmstrasse 96 13593 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leistikowstr. 2 14050 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00967575.2 | 09.09.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000DE03190 | Priority number, date | DE1999146114 | 17.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19946114 | [2002/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0122385 | Date: | 29.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212743 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212743 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09B23/28, G09B23/34 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
G09B23/283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2003/18] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KIEFERMODELL | [2002/24] | English: | JAW MODEL | [2002/24] | French: | MODELE DE MACHOIRE | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 28.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2333795 (ERNEST KELLERMAN, et al) [X] 1 * page 1, column L, lines 14-23 * * page 1, column R, lines 3-18 * * page 2, column L, line 18 - column R, line 6 * * figures 1-10 * [Y] 6; | [A]US2669779 (GUIDO ZUCCOLI) [A] 1,3,6,7 * column 1, lines 1-23 * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 41 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4846684 (OESTREICH GERD [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 30-55 * * column 2, lines 7-31 * * figures 1-4 *; | [YD]US5222891 (POVEROMO MELVIN D [US]) [YD] 6 * column 4, lines 7-20 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 25 * * figures 1-12 *; | [PX]DE29916978U (OESTREICH GERD [DE]) [PX] 1-8* the whole document * | by applicant | DE3843106 | US5222891 |