EP1216302 - IMMUNOGENIC POLYPEPTIDE DERIVED FROM MORAXELLA CATARRHALIS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a. rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOGICALS S.A. 89 rue de l'Institut 1330 Rixensart / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THONNARD, Joelle SmithKline Beecham Biol. s.a., Rue de l'Inst. 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00967819.4 | 26.09.2000 | [2002/26] | WO2000EP09495 | Priority number, date | GB19990023156 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: GB 9923156 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0123416 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1216302 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C12N15/63, C07K14/195, C07K16/12, G01N33/53, G01N33/68, A61K39/02 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/212 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
A61K2039/53 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/26] | Title | German: | IMMUNOGENES POLYPEPTIDE AUS MORAXELLA CATARRHALIS UND DESSEN VERWENDUNGEN | [2002/26] | English: | IMMUNOGENIC POLYPEPTIDE DERIVED FROM MORAXELLA CATARRHALIS AND USES THEREOF | [2002/26] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES | [2002/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 23.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |