|
14.10.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2008 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2007 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2007 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2007 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.04.2007 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.01.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2006 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.04.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
29.11.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.2003 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (reply to communication from Examining Division too late) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2003 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
20.02.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.12.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.12.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.05.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |