EP1222687 - IMPROVED PECVD AND CVD PROCESSES FOR WNx DEPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENUS, INC. 1139 Karlstad Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2002/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALEWSKI, Carl, J. 170 Aromitas Road Aromas, CA 95004 / US | 02 /
SANDS, Claude, A. 639 Paco Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 03 /
VELASCO, Hector 1163 Park Grove Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 04 /
MATTHYSSE, Lawrence 3433 Buckner Drive San Jose, CA 95127 / US | 05 /
SEIDEL, Thomas 965 East El Camino Real 933 Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Bulling, Alexander Dreiss Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Bulling, Alexander, Dr. Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00968372.3 | 19.09.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000US25713 | Priority number, date | US19990410109 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: US 410109 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0124227 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1222687 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/285, H01L21/3205 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
C23C16/56 (EP,US);
H01L21/205 (KR);
C23C16/34 (EP,US);
C23C16/4404 (EP,US);
H01L21/28088 (EP,US);
H01L21/28097 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/29] | H01L21/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES PECVD UND CVD -VERFAHREN FÜR DIE ABSCHEIDUNG VON WNx | [2002/29] | English: | IMPROVED PECVD AND CVD PROCESSES FOR WNx DEPOSITION | [2002/29] | French: | PROCESSUS DE DEPOT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR ACTIVE PAR PLASMA ET DE DEPOT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR POUR DEPOT DE WNx | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 14.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/37] | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9823389 (GENUS INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 4, line 8 - page 8, line 4 * * page 10, line 16 - page 14, line 2 * * page 17, line 16 - page 18, line 12; figure 3 * [A] 10,16,19; | [XAY]US5487923 (MIN SUK-KI [KR], et al) [X] 10 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 62; figure 1 * [A] 16,17,19,21,23 [Y] 22; | [XAY]US4897709 (YOKOYAMA NATSUKI [JP], et al) [X] 10 * column 2, line 55 - line 66 * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 18 * * column 8, line 20 - line 46 * * column 9, line 37 - column 10, line 28 * * column 11, line 10 - line 16 * * column 11, line 39 - line 65 * * column 12, line 55 - line 61 * * column 14, line 6 - line 54 * * column 15, line 53 - column 16, line 17 * * column 16, line 62 - column 17, line 11; figures 2,8,10,12,14a-c,15 * [A] 19-21 [Y] 12,16; | [XA]US5916634 (FLEMING JAMES G [US], et al) [X] 10 * column 8, line 25 - line 41 * [A] 16,19; | [XAY]US5691235 (MEIKLE SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 14 * column 1, line 43 - line 48 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 9 * [A] 13,20,21,23 [Y] 12,16,22; | [A]US5558717 (ZHAO JUN [US], et al) [A] 11-15,18,20,22 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 22 * * column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 11 * * column 14, line 62 - column 15, line 35; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH10199874 ; | [PA]US6055927 (SHANG QUANYUAN [US], et al) [PA] 11-15,18,20 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1024210 (ULVAC CORP [JP]) [PX] 10 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10199874 A 19980731 (APPLIED KOMATSU TECHNOL KK) [A] 11-15,18,20 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5487923 (MIN SUK-KI [KR], et al); | [X]WO9823389 (GENUS INC [US]); | [A]US5558717 (ZHAO JUN [US], et al) |