EP1244404 - DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH CONTAINMENT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DRYPERS CORPORATION Suite 900, 5300 Memorial Houston, TX 77007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Drypers Corporation Suite 900, 5300 Memorial Houston, TX 77007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEMP, Walter, V. 1973 W. Clay Houston, TX 77019 / US | 02 /
DUCKER, Paul, M. 6705 NE 53rd Circle Vancouver, WA 98661 / US | 03 /
GARDNER, Daniel, D., Jr. 7275 Tor Lane Petosky, MI 49770 / US | 04 /
SNEED, Scott, Associated Hygienic Products 4455 River Green Parkway Duluth, GA 30096-2565 / US | [2003/01] |
Former [2002/40] | 01 /
KLEMP, Walter, V. 1973 W. Clay Houston, TX 77019 / US | ||
02 /
DUCKER, Paul, M. 6705 NE 53rd Circle Vancouver, WA 98661 / US | |||
03 /
GARDNER, Daniel, D., Jr. 7275 Tor Lane Petosky, MI 49770 / US | |||
04 /
SNEED, Scott 902 Laurelfield Friendswood, TX 77546 / US | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00968948.0 | 12.10.2000 | [2002/40] | WO2000US28167 | Priority number, date | US19990418902 | 15.10.1999 Original published format: US 418902 | US20000502323 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: US 502323 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0128480 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1244404 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F13/20 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
A61F13/49466 (EP,US);
A61F13/49012 (EP,US);
A61F13/495 (EP,US);
A61F13/512 (EP,US);
A61F13/5323 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/40] | Extension states | AL | 08.05.2002 | LT | 08.05.2002 | LV | 08.05.2002 | MK | 08.05.2002 | RO | 08.05.2002 | SI | 08.05.2002 | Title | German: | WEGWERFBARER ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT EINDÄMMUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2002/40] | English: | DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH CONTAINMENT STRUCTURE | [2002/40] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT JETABLE COMPRENANT UNE STRUCTURE DE CONFINEMENT | [2002/40] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 19.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/42] | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4892536 (DESMARAIS THOMAS A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 9 - line 10 * * column 1, line 43 - line 44 * * column 3, line 32 - line 61 * * column 4, line 19 - line 24 *; | [A]WO9111161 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB]) [A] 1-29* the whole document *; | [X]US5295987 (WIDLUND LEIF U R [SE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15-22,24-29 * figures 1-4 * * column 1, line 6 - line 13 * * column 1, line 61 - line 65 * * column 2, line 14 - line 15 * * column 3, line 10 - line 18 * * column 4, line 7 - line 12 *; | [X]US5383870 (TAKAI HISASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 8 * * column 2, line 48 - line 63 *; | [X]US5873868 (NAKAHATA HIROSHI [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US5941863 (GUIDOTTI TED [SE], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10,19-24 * figures 1-6 * * column 1, line 4 - line 13 * * column 3, line 5 - line 57 * * column 6, line 23 - column 7, line 4 * * column 7, line 35 - line 47 * * column 11, line 23 - line 25 *; | [E]EP1055403 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,6,7,11-15,19-21,23-29 * figures 1-10 * * column 1, line 10 - line 11 * * column 2, line 20 - line 44 * * column 5, line 8 - line 44 * * column 6, line 15 - line 17 * * column 9, line 53 - line 55 * | International search | [A]US4036233 (KOZAK THEODORE FREDRICK); | [A]US4681580 (REISING GEORGE S [US], et al); | [X]US4892536 (DESMARAIS THOMAS A [US], et al); | [A]US4968312 (KHAN SARBULAND [US]); | [A]US5295987 (WIDLUND LEIF U R [SE], et al); | [A]US5397316 (LAVON GARY D [US], et al); | [A]US5746732 (OLSSON STEFAN [SE], et al); | [Y]US5863288 (BAKER ANDREW T [US]); | [A]US5873868 (NAKAHATA HIROSHI [US]); | [A]US5941863 (GUIDOTTI TED [SE], et al); | [AP]US5986167 (ARTEMAN DAVID JEROME [US], et al); | [XE]US6135988 (TURNER LAURA JEAN [US], et al); | [AE]US6156020 (ROE DONALD C [US], et al) |