EP1242826 - ACCELERATION SENSOR WITH LIMITED MOVABILITY IN THE VERTICAL DIRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RETTIG, Rasmus Schillerstrasse 3/1 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 02 /
KOHN, Oliver Novalisweg 4 72770 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
FISCHER, Frank Robert-Koch-Strasse 8 72810 Gomaringen / DE | 04 /
SCHUBERT, Dietrich Mozartstrasse 69 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [2002/39] | Application number, filing date | 00969205.4 | 25.08.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000DE02913 | Priority number, date | DE1999149605 | 15.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19949605 | [2002/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0129565 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242826 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1242826 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/08 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
B81B3/0051 (EP,US);
G01P15/125 (EP,KR,US);
B81B7/007 (KR);
G01C19/5642 (KR);
G01P15/0802 (EP,US);
B81B2201/0235 (EP,US);
G01P2015/0814 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/20] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BESCHLEUNIGUNGSSENSOR MIT EINGESCHRÄNKTER BEWEGLICHKEIT IN VERTIKALER RICHTUNG | [2002/39] | English: | ACCELERATION SENSOR WITH LIMITED MOVABILITY IN THE VERTICAL DIRECTION | [2002/39] | French: | CAPTEUR D'ACCELERATION A MOBILITE LIMITEE DANS LE SENS VERTICAL | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 17.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9912002 (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1,3-7 * page 12, paragraph 4; figure 7 * * page 10, paragraph 5 *; | [Y]DE19830476 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * column 3, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5121633 (MURAKAMI KOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figures 1,6,15,19,21,27 *; | [A]DE3920645 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0766089 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |