EP1230386 - DIAGNOSIS KIT, METHOD AND MICROARRAY FOR DETERMINING HUMAN DETOXIFICATION CAPACITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adnagen AG Ostpassage 7 30853 Hannover-Langenhagen / DE | [2002/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASCHÜTZA, Stefanie Mühlenweg 11 29227 Celle / DE | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00969543.8 | 25.10.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000EP10478 | Priority number, date | DE1999155024 | 16.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19955024 | [2002/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0136670 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1230386 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP);
C12Q2600/106 (EP);
C12Q2600/142 (EP);
C12Q2600/156 (EP);
C12Q2600/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSE-KIT, VERFAHREN UND MIKROARRAY ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER MENSCHLICHEN ENTGIFTUNGSFÄHIGKEIT | [2002/33] | English: | DIAGNOSIS KIT, METHOD AND MICROARRAY FOR DETERMINING HUMAN DETOXIFICATION CAPACITY | [2002/33] | French: | KIT DE DIAGNOSTIC, PROCEDE ET JEU ORDONNE D'ECHANTILLONS PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER L'APTITUDE HUMAINE A LA DESINTOXICATION | [2002/33] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 25.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/45] | 16.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2005 | 31.10.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]DE19738908 (WASCHUETZA STEFANIE DR) [DX] 1-4,8-10,15-17,28-35,42 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 35; claims 1-16 * * page 4, line 59 - page 5, line 16 * [Y] 25-27,46; | [XY]US5919627 (CORLEY NEIL C ET AL) [X] 18-23,44,45 * column 1 - column 2, line 25 * * column 27, line 36 - column 29, line 10 * * claims 10,11 * [Y] 25-27,46; | [PX]GB2339200 (GENOSTIC PHARMA LTD) [PX] 18-24,45 * page 42; examples 5,7,9; claims 1,12,31-34 * | [X] - PEMBLE SALLY ET AL, "Human glutathione S-transferase theta (GSTT1): cDNA cloning and the characterization of a genetic polymorphism.", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1994), vol. 300, no. 1, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 271 - 276, XP000934185 [X] 1-4,6,28-30 * page 274, column L, paragraph L - page 274, column R * | [X] - ABDEL-RAHMAN SHERIF Z ET AL, "A multiplex PCR procedure for polymorphic analysis of GSTM1 and GSTT1 genes in population studies.", CANCER LETTERS, (1996), vol. 107, no. 2, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 229 - 233, XP000934095 [X] 1-4,8-10,17,28-31 * figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3835(96)04832-X | [X] - SHI MICHAEL M ET AL, "High-throughput genotyping method for glutathione S-transferase T1 and M1 gene deletions using TaqMan(R) probes.", RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS IN MOLECULAR PATHOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY, (199901), vol. 103, no. 1, ISSN 1078-0297, pages 3 - 15, XP000934086 [X] 1-6,8-10 * page 3 - page 5 * |