EP1229125 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYPEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA, Tatsuya Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. Tech. Res. Lab. 1-1, Kyowa-cho Hofu-shi Yamaguchi 747-8522 / JP | 02 /
KONNO, Yoshinobu Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. Tokyo Res. Lab. 6-6, Asahi-machi 3-chome Machida-shi Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | 03 /
AKASHI, Naohisa Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. Tech. Res. Lab. 1-1, Kyowa-cho Hofu-shi Yamaguchi 747-8522 / JP | 04 /
TAKASUGI, Hiroshi Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. Tokyo Res. Lab. 6-6, Asahi-machi 3-chome Machida-shi Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | 05 /
SUGIMOTO, Seiji Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. Tokyo Res. Lab. 6-6, Asahi-machi 3-chome Machida-shi Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | 06 /
YANO, Keiichi Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. Tokyo Res. Lab. 6-6, Asahi-machi 3-chome Machida-shi Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00969908.3 | 19.10.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000JP07288 | Priority number, date | JP19990296267 | 19.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29626799 | [2002/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0129246 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1229125 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00, C12N5/06, C12N15/11, C12R1/91 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/32] | C12P21/00, C12N5/06, C12N15/11, // C12P21:00, C12R1:91 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POLYPEPTIDS | [2002/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYPEPTIDE | [2002/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN POLYPEPTIDE | [2002/32] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2002 | Translation filed | 17.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/33] | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/33] | Request for further processing for: | 13.03.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5658789 (QUARANTA VITO [US], et al) [X] 22 * example 8 *; | [Y]EP0625574 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US4757018 (BROWN BRUCE L [US]); | [A]EP0292965 (CETUS CORP [US]); | [A]US5614385 (OPPERMANN HERMANN [US], et al) | [Y] - RASMUSSEN B ET AL, "ISOLATION, CHARACTERIZATION AND RECOMBINANT PROTEIN EXPRESSION IN VEGGIE-CHO: A SERUM-FREE CHO HOST CELL LINE", CYTOTECHNOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (1998), vol. 28, ISSN 0920-9069, pages 31 - 42, XP000972719 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008052908496 | [Y] - ZHOU W ET AL, "LARGE SCALE PRODUCTION OF RECOMBINANT MOUSE AND RAT GROWTH HORMONE BY FED-BATCH GS-NSO CELL CULTURES", CYTOTECHNOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (1996), vol. 22, no. 1-3, ISSN 0920-9069, pages 239 - 250, XP009012111 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00353944 | [Y] - SHITARA K ET AL, "A NEW VECTOR FOR THE HIGH LEVEL EXPRESSION OF CHIMERIC ANTIBODIES IN MYELOMA CELLS", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (19940201), vol. 167, no. 1/2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 271 - 278, XP002911931 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(94)90096-5 | [A] - ZHOU W ET AL, "Fed-batch culture of recombinant NS0 myeloma cells with high monoclonal antibody production", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LONDON, GB, (1997), vol. 55, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 783 - 792, XP002170348 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19970905)55:5<783::AID-BIT8>3.0.CO;2-7 | [A] - BERG D T ET AL, "HIGH-LEVEL EXPRESSION OF SECRETED PROTEINS FROM CELLS ADAPTED TO SERUM-FREE SUSPENSION CULTURE", BIOTECHNIQUES, EATON PUBLISHING, NATICK, US, (199306), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 972 - 978, XP002059902 | International search | [A]JPH11127890 ; | [A]JPH0949836 ; | [A]WO9733978 ; | [A]EP0481791 ; | [A]WO8605807 ; | [A] - STEVENSON GEOFFREY A. ET AL., "Rat carcinoma calls in long-term, serum-free culture provide a continuing supply of collagenase", BIOSCIENCE REPORTS, (198512), vol. 5, no. 12, pages 1071 - 1077, XP002936319 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01119628 | [A] - ATKISON PAUL R. ET AL., "Production of somatomedin-like activity by human adult tumor-derived, transformed and normal cell cultures and by cultured rat hepatocytes: Effects of culture conditions and of epidermal growth factor (urogastrone)", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND CELL BIOLOGY, (198412), vol. 62, no. 12, pages 1343 - 1350, XP002936320 |