EP1154000 - COATING MATERIAL FOR FORMING TRANSPARENT AND CONDUCTIVE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO., LTD. 1, Kandamitoshiro-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8677 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO., LTD. 1, Kandamitoshiro-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8677 / JP | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO., LTD. 1, Kandamitoshiro-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IZAWA, Hajime, Sumitomo Osaka Cement Co. Ltd Advanced Materials Div., 585, Toyotomi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8601 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Yuji, Sumitomo Osaka Cement Co. Ltd Advanced Materials Div., 585, Toyotomi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8601 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Shinichi, Sumitomo Osaka Cement Co Ltd Advanced Materials Div., 585, Toyotomi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8601 / JP | 04 /
WAKABAYASHI, Atsumi, Sumitomo Osaka Cement Co. Ltd Advanced Materials Div., 585, Toyotomi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8601 / JP | 05 /
MOTOKI, Toru, Sumitomo Osaka Cement Co. Ltd Advanced Materials Div., 585, Toyotomi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8601 / JP | 06 /
HORIKOSHI, Hideki, Sumitomo Osaka Cement Co. Ltd Advanced Materials Div., 585, Toyotomi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8601 / JP | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00969990.1 | 23.10.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000JP07379 | Priority number, date | JP19990310172 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: JP 31017299 | [2001/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0132792 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1154000 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154000 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D201/00, C09D7/12, C09D5/24, G02B1/10, H01B5/14, H01J29/28 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
G02B1/111 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/24 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/007 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/008 (EP,US);
C03C17/009 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/61 (KR);
C09D7/67 (KR);
G02B1/116 (EP,KR,US);
H01B1/20 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DURCHSICHTIGEN UND LEITFÄHIGEN FILMEN | [2001/46] | English: | COATING MATERIAL FOR FORMING TRANSPARENT AND CONDUCTIVE FILM | [2001/46] | French: | MATERIAU DE REVETEMENT POUR LA FORMATION D'UN FILM TRANSPARENT CONDUCTEUR | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2001 | Translation filed | 27.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5504133 (MUROUCHI MASATO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 41; claim -; table 1 *; | [X]US5204177 (SATO GORO [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 1 - column 6, line 33; examples 15,16; claim 1; table 1 *; | [E]EP1057621 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [E] 1-5 * page 2, line 49 - page 8, line 31; claim -; table 2 * | International search | [X]JPH11218604 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JPH09221558 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JPH0649394 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JPH05331386 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]US5518810 (NISHIHARA AKIRA [JP], et al); | [X]JPH08102227 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [X]JPH08143792 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP, et al); | [A]JPH08165147 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [A]JPH07310033 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) |