EP1231288 - COMPOSITE MATERIAL CONTAINING ULTRA-HARD PARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2010/15] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIGUTI, Hideki; Itami Works Sumitomo Ele.Ind.Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 02 /
TSUDUKI, Katsunori Itami Works Sumitomo Ele.Ind.Ltd 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 03 /
IKEGAYA, Akihiko Itami Works Sumitomo Ele.Ind.Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00970011.3 | 23.10.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000JP07403 | Priority number, date | JP19990308963 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30896399 | [2002/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0132947 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1231288 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1231288 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C22C26/00 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
C04B35/575 (EP,US);
C22C26/00 (EP,KR);
B22F1/18 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/111 (EP,US);
C04B35/488 (EP,US);
C04B35/52 (EP,US);
C04B35/5607 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/58 (EP,US);
C04B35/58014 (EP,US);
C04B35/581 (EP,US);
C04B35/5831 (EP,US);
C04B35/593 (EP,US);
C04B35/62834 (EP);
C04B35/62836 (EP);
C04B35/645 (EP);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C09K3/1445 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F3/14, B22F3/105 (EP);
B22F2999/00, C22C1/051, B22F1/12, B22F2202/01 (KR,EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KOMPOSITMATERIAL MIT ULTRAHARTEN PARTIKELN | [2002/33] | English: | COMPOSITE MATERIAL CONTAINING ULTRA-HARD PARTICLE | [2002/33] | French: | MATIERE COMPOSITE CONTENANT DES PARTICULES ULTRA-DURES | [2002/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2001 | Translation filed | 19.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.10.2010 | [2011/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5585175 (BRANDRUP-WOGNSEN HELENE [SE], et al) [A] 1-15* examples 1,2 * | International search | [A]JPH0524922 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN); | [A]JPH08109431 (READ KK); | [A]JPH08176696 (CHICHIBU ONODA CEMENT CORP); | [X]EP0774527 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [Y]JPH10310840 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JPH05239585 | JPH08109431 | JPH08176696 | US5585175 | EP0774527 | JPH09194978 | JPH10310840 |