EP1240823 - N-CALCIUM CHANNEL KNOCKOUT ANIMAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [2007/28] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INO, Mitsuhiro Kurea Ushiku 303 3-6, Chuo 5-chome Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1234 / JP | 02 /
MIYAMOTO, Norimasa 12-35, Ninomiya 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0051 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Eiki Mezongrandiru 512 3-10-7, Tamiya Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1237 / JP | 04 /
OKI, Toru 2-14, Minami 5-chome Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1222 / JP | 05 /
YOSHINAGA, Takashi 702-76, Shimohirooka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0042 / JP | 06 /
HATAKEYAMA, Shinji 1-1-22, Chuo Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1234 / JP | 07 /
NIIDOME, Tetsuhiro 23-13, Matsuba 6-chome Ryugasaki-shi, Ibaraki 301-0043 / JP | 08 /
SAWADA, Kohei 5-14, Matsumaedai 6-chome, Moriya-machi Kitasoma-gun, Ibaraki 302-0102 / JP | 09 /
NISHIZAWA, Yukio 6-32, Matsushiro 4-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0035 / JP | 10 /
TANAKA, Isao 5-16, Ninomiya 2-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0051 / JP | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Dean, John Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Dean, John Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2002/38] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00970097.2 | 26.10.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000JP07503 | Priority number, date | JP19990303809 | 26.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30380999 | JP20000037839 | 16.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000037839 | JP20000261979 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000261979 | [2007/51] |
Former [2002/38] | JP19990303809 | 26.10.1999 | |
JP20000000378 | 16.02.2000 | ||
JP20000000261 | 31.08.2000 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0130137 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240823 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1240823 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, G01N33/50, G01N33/15, A61K45/00, A61P9/12, A61P3/10, A61P25/04, C12N15/12, C07K14/705 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
A01K67/0276 (EP);
A01K67/027 (KR);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP);
C12N15/8509 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2002/38] | A01K67/027, G01N33/50, G01N33/15, A61K45/00, A61P9/12, A61P3/10, A61P25/04, C12N15/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/38] | Title | German: | N-KALZIUM-KANAL-"KNOCKOUT-TIER" | [2002/38] | English: | N-CALCIUM CHANNEL KNOCKOUT ANIMAL | [2002/38] | French: | ANIMAL KNOCKOUT A CANAL N-CALCIUM | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2002 | Translation filed | 15.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 21.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 03.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 03.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2008 | CY | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | IE | 26.10.2008 | LU | 26.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | PT | 20.01.2009 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
CY | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 26.10.2008 | ||
LU | 26.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 26.10.2008 | ||
LU | 26.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 26.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9946383 (UNIV BROWN RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1-8,11,14,17* page 38, line 21 - line 28 * | International search | [Y]WO9304083 (SALK INST BIOTECH IND [US]); | [A]US5677288 (MARANGOS PAUL J [US]); | [Y] - FEBS LETTERS, (1994), vol. 338, pages 1 - 5, XP002936371 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(94)80105-3 | [A] - TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (1997), vol. 18, no. 10, pages 363 - 371, XP002936372 | [Y] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 12010 - 12015, XP002936373 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.20.12010 | [YP] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (20000323), vol. 97, pages 6132 - 6137, XP002936374 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.100124197 | [YP] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (19991221), vol. 96, pages 15245 - 15250, XP002936375 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.26.15245 | [Y] - SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 257, pages 389 - 395, XP002936376 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1321501 | [Y] - NATURE, (1988), vol. 336, pages 348 - 352, XP002936377 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/336348a0 | [Y] - CLINICAL ENGINEERING, (1996), vol. 7, no. 12, pages 1085 - 1090, XP002936378 | [YP] - KYUSHU SHIKA GAKKAI ZASSHI, (20000225), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 162 - 171, XP002936379 | [Y] - JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (1990), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 675 - 680, XP002936380 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005344-199010000-00022 | [Y] - JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (1996), vol. 278, no. 3, pages 1392 - 1407, XP002936381 |