EP1334099 - HERBICIDALLY ACTIVE PYRIDINE SULFONYL UREA DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem Investment Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong, Yongdungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | [2004/10] |
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states LG Chem Investment, Ltd. 20, Yuido-dong Yongduengpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOO, Suk-Jin Expo Apt. 403-801 Junmin-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-390 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Jin-Ho Expo Apt. 509-601 Junmin-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-390 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jeong-Su Expo Apt. 410-901 Junmin-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-762 / KR | 04 /
KANG, Seung-Hun Eunhasu Apt. 106-102 Dunsan-dong Seo-gu Taejon 302-120 / KR | 05 /
KANG, Kyung-Goo Song-gang Green Apt. 317-503 Song-gang-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-751 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Dae-Whang Hanbit Apt. 132-304 Uh-eun-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-755 / KR | 07 /
CHANG, Hae-Sung R&D Park,LG Life Sciences Ltd.104-1 Moongi-dong Yuseong-gu Taejeon 305-380 / KR | 08 /
KO, Young-Kwan Hanbit Apt. 102-1702 Uh-eun-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-755 / KR | 09 /
RYU, Jae-Wook Hanbit Apt. 120-305 Uh-eun-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-755 / KR | [2003/48] |
Former [2003/33] | 01 /
KOO, Suk-Jin Expo Apt. 403-801 Junmin-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-390 / KR | ||
02 /
CHO, Jin-Ho Expo Apt. 509-601 Junmin-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-390 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Jeong-Su Expo Apt. 410-901 Junmin-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-762 / KR | |||
04 /
KANG, Seung-Hun Eunhasu Apt. 106-102 Dunsan-dong Seo-gu Taejon 302-120 / KR | |||
05 /
KANG, Kyung-Goo Song-gang Green Apt. 317-503 Song-gang-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-751 / KR | |||
06 /
KIM, Dae-Whang Hanbit Apt. 132-304 Uh-eun-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-755 / KR | |||
07 /
CHANG, Hae-Sung Hanbit Apt. 105-201 Uh-eun-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-755 / KR | |||
08 /
KO, Young-Kwan Hanbit Apt. 102-1702 Uh-eun-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-755 / KR | |||
09 /
RYU, Jae-Wook Hanbit Apt. 120-305 Uh-eun-dong Yusong-gu Taejon 305-755 / KR | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 00970259.8 | 12.10.2000 | [2003/33] | WO2000KR01138 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0230921 | Date: | 18.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1334099 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1334099 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D213/26, A01N43/40, A01N47/36 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
C07D521/00 (EP,US);
A01N47/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRIDINSULFONYLHARNSTOFFDERIVATE MIT HERBIZIDER WIRKUNG | [2003/33] | English: | HERBICIDALLY ACTIVE PYRIDINE SULFONYL UREA DERIVATIVES | [2003/33] | French: | DERIVES DE PYRIDINE SULFONYL UREE A ACTIVITE HERBICIDE | [2003/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2002 | Translation filed | 19.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 04.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2004 | BE | 10.03.2004 | CY | 10.03.2004 | FI | 10.03.2004 | NL | 10.03.2004 | DK | 10.06.2004 | GR | 10.06.2004 | SE | 10.06.2004 | ES | 21.06.2004 | PT | 10.08.2004 | IE | 12.10.2004 | LU | 12.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CY | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
IE | 12.10.2004 | ||
LU | 12.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
IE | 12.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
SE | 10.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO9214728 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR]); | [A]WO9612708 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR], et al) |