EP1290121 - HARD SURFACE CLEANING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERRY, Alan, Edward 235 Loraine Avenue, 7 Cincinnati, OH 45220 / US | 02 /
POLICICCHIO, Nicola, John 4976 Laurelwood Court Mason, OH 45040 / US | 03 /
CELLA, Cynthia, Elaine 2930 Resor Road Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 04 /
FLORA, Jeffrey, Lawrence 7785 Yellowwood Drive Mason, OH 45040 / US | 05 /
TRINH, Toan 8671 Creekwood Lane Maineville, OH 45039 / US | 06 /
MORELLI, Joseph Paul 10622 NE, 173rd place Bothell, WA 98011 / US | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Clarkson, Paul Magnus, et al Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st floor, Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2003/11] | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services SA, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 00970492.5 | 26.09.2000 | [2003/11] | WO2000US26401 | Priority number, date | US19990156286P | 27.09.1999 Original published format: US 156286 P | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0123510 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1290121 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1290121 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/66, C11D3/37, C11D1/72, C11D1/14 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
C11D17/049 (EP);
A47L13/17 (EP);
D04H1/492 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSMITTEL FÜR HARTE OBERFLÄCHEN | [2003/11] | English: | HARD SURFACE CLEANING COMPOSITIONS | [2003/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE NETTOYAGE POUR SURFACES DURES | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 17.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05028152.6 / EP1661503 | EP08167764.3 / EP2036481 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | BE | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | FI | 29.10.2008 | NL | 29.10.2008 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 29.10.2008 |